Washburn v. Collection Bureau of Ft. Walton Beach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wendy Washburn
Defendant: Collection Bureau of Ft. Walton Beach, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00934
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #9 Notice of Settlement. As requested by Plaintiff in that Notice, the Court hereby orders Plaintiff to file for dismissal of her case by September 30, 2019, and the Court hereby stays all other deadlines in this action pending Plaintiff's dismissal. Should Plaintiff fail to dismiss by September 30th, the Court hereby orders the Parties to submit a Joint Status Report by October 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/18/2019. (SRD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Wendy Washburn (Philipps, David)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed (certified mail). Collection Bureau of Ft. Walton Beach, Inc. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (KWC)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to the Collection Bureau of Ft. Walton Beach, Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 20th day of June, 2019. (JLC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze from the Unassigned Judge A civil cases. (KAM)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/19/19. (MMW)
June 18, 2019 PHV Fee paid by David J Philipps, in the amount of $75.00, credit card receipt number 1126-3371344; USDC receipt number B4601098522. (Philipps, David) Modified on 6/19/2019 (KWC)
June 18, 2019 PHV Fee paid by David J Philipps, in the amount of $75.00, credit card receipt number 1126-3371337; USDC receipt number B4601098521 (Philipps, David) Modified on 6/19/2019 (KWC)
June 18, 2019 Filing Fee received from David J. Philipps in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3371333; USDC receipt number B4601098520; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Collection Bureau of Ft. Walton Beach, Inc., filed by Wendy Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KWC). (Philipps, David) Modified on 6/18/2019 (KWC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL by Wendy Washburn. (KWC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE BY David Philipps and Mary Philipps filed by Wendy Washburn. (KWC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Wendy Washburn. (KWC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collection Bureau of Ft. Walton Beach, Inc., filed by Wendy Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washburn v. Collection Bureau of Ft. Walton Beach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collection Bureau of Ft. Walton Beach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Washburn
Represented By: Bradford W Botes
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?