Akber v. McAleenan
Defendant: William P. Barr
Petitioner: Nasim Akber
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00946
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Petitioner has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to respond. Thereafter, the petition will be taken under advisement by the Court, and the undersigned will enter a report and recommendation without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/31/2019. (KEK)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to re #2 Order to Show Cause dated June 20, 2019 filed by William P. Barr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Cheek, Jason)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Respondents have moved for an extension of time to file their answer. #4 . That motion is GRANTED, and Respondents' answer is due by August 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/18/2019. (PSM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause, dated June 20, 2019 by William P. Barr. (Cheek, Jason)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of William P. Barr (Cheek, Jason)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SHOW CAUSE ORDER Petitioner Nasim Akber has filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. #1 . Petitioner is presently confined in Etowah County Detention Center. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Respondent appear and show cause in writing within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/20/2019. (PSM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00 receipt #B4601098559), filed by Nasim Akber.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akber v. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nasim Akber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?