Negash v. Horton et al
Petitioner: Awot Negash
Respondent: Jonathan Horton, Mark Morgan, Kevin McAleenan, George H Lund, III, William Barr and Keith Peek
Case Number: 4:2019cv00951
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned RECOMMENDS the petitioner's claims be DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/29/2019. (PSM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by William Barr, George H Lund, III, Kevin McAleenan, Mark Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Marshall, Mary)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William Barr, George H Lund, III, Kevin McAleenan, Mark Morgan (Marshall, Mary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Awot Negash (Vosburgh, Jessica)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Stevens Wilson on behalf of William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Mark Morgan (Wilson, Sarah)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE This is an action on a petition for writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Awot Negash. Petitioner challenges the legality of his continued detention by federal immigration authorities pending his removal from the United States under the Immigration and Nationality Act, 8 U.S.C. 1101 et seq. (See #1 ). Petitioner has paid the filing fee. It is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/27/2019. (PSM)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601098589. (JLC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Awot Negash of Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4 to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Awot Negash.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negash v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Awot Negash
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathan Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Morgan
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George H Lund, III
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?