Singh v. Morgan et al
Petitioner: Balbir Singh
Respondent: George H. Lund, III, Keith Peek, Jonathon W Horton, Mark Morgan, William Barr and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00961
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Petitioner's traverse is due by September 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/19/2019. (CDG)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Order,, by Balbir Singh. (Nguyen, Phi)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER notifying Petitioner that Respondent filed a #9 Response to the petition in the above-styled case in which they seek to have the petition summarily dismissed without an evidentiary hearing and to further inform the Petitioner of his right to file affidavits or other materials in opposition to the response and of the possible consequences of not responding. Petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to respond. Thereafter, the petition will be taken under advisement by the Court, and the undersigned will enter a Report and Recommendation without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/1/2019. (JLC)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to re #5 , #1 filed by William Barr, Jonathon W Horton, George H. Lund, III, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark Morgan, Keith Peek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pitman Declaration, #2 Exhibit B: Singh Sworn Statement)(Wilson, Sarah)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Respondents' answer is due by July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 7/24/2019. (CDG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Order to Show Cause by William Barr, Jonathon W Horton, George H. Lund, III, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark Morgan, Keith Peek. (Wilson, Sarah)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of William Barr, Jonathon W Horton, George H. Lund, III, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark Morgan, Keith Peek (Cheek, Jason)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Respondents are hereby ORDERED to APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/24/2019. (JLC)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601098588. (JLC)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING; Petitioner's pleading is deficient for the reasons indicated. Petitioner must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order as set out herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/24/2019. (JLC)
June 21, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3375006. (Nguyen, Phi)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney Phi Nguyen, but with the understanding and on the condition she pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless she has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 6/21/2019. (CDG)
June 21, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Phi Nguyen in the amount of $75.00, receipt number B4601098582. (JLC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Balibir Singh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Phi Nguyen)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Balbir Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Balbir Singh
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Phi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George H. Lund, III
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Peek
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathon W Horton
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Morgan
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?