Jones v. Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keith Jones
Defendant: Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC and Jeremiah Lightsey
Case Number: 4:2019cv00965
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 8/5/2019; atty Allen Arnold present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 11:15 a.m. on August 5, 2019. (Doc. #9 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/2/2019. (MSN)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC. filed by Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC (Mills, Wallace)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeremiah Lightsey. filed by Jeremiah Lightsey (Mills, Wallace)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/23/19. (MRR, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than September 5, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after September 5, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for August 5, 2019 at 11:15 a.m.. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/23/19. (MRR, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC, Jeremiah Lightsey.(Mills, Wallace)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (MRR, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeremiah Lightsey served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (MRR, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC, Jeremiah Lightsey, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3375708 (B4601098590). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keith Jones.(MRR, ). (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 6/24/2019 (MRR, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Keith Jones (MRR, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Keith Jones. (MRR, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keith Jones.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Jones
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Square Roofing & Construction LLC
Represented By: Wallace D Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Lightsey
Represented By: Wallace D Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?