Atangana v. Barr et al
Defendant: ICE Field Office, Director
Petitioner: Lionel Roussel Atangana
Respondent: Warden, William P Barr and Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv00989
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lionel Roussel Atangana; envelope marked "Released 7/24/2019" (KAM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lionel Roussel Atangana (KAM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time; Respondents shall respond to the order to show cause by 8/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/1/2019. (KAM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by William P Barr, ICE Field Office, Director, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. (Marshall, Mary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William P Barr, ICE Field Office, Director, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (Marshall, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; respondents shall appear and show cause within 20 days, why the relief requested from by the petitioner should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/8/2019. (KAM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5. rec# B4601098633), filed by Lionel Roussel Atangana.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atangana v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Field Office, Director
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lionel Roussel Atangana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?