Hill v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Francine Hill
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2019cv01081
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francine Hill. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 8/12/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (JLC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on July 12, 2019. (ABN)
July 11, 2019 Request for service by USM (certified mail) found within complaint, filed by Francine Hill. (KWC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francine Hill. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(KWC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Francine Hill.(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Hill
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?