Otwell et al v. Home Point Financial Corp
Plaintiff: Joshua Otwell and Danna Lee Otwell
Defendant: Home Point Financial Corp
Case Number: 4:2019cv01120
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Danna Lee Otwell, Joshua Otwell of Filing Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties Planning Meeting (Herring, M)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for one week extension to briefing schedule re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response is due on or before September 18, 2019. Defendant's reply is due on or before September 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/9/2019. (RLW)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 Order, #10 MOTION to Dismiss by Danna Lee Otwell, Joshua Otwell. (Watts, John)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER - The parties having failed to timely file a report of their planning meeting pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties meet and file said report no later than September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/5/19. (SAC)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re #10 MOTION to Dismiss - Responses are due on or before September 11, 2019. A reply, if any, is due on or before September 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/28/19. (SAC)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Brief re #10 MOTION to Dismiss . (Pittman, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Home Point Financial Corp. (Pittman, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #2 Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint in light of Plaintiff's filing of the #7 amended complaint. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/14/2019. (RLW)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion To Dismiss filed by Danna Lee Otwell, Joshua Otwell. (Watts, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Home Point Financial Corp, filed by Joshua Otwell, Danna Lee Otwell.(Watts, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Point Financial Corp. filed by Home Point Financial Corp (Pittman, Timothy)
July 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 8/13/2019; Replies due by 8/20/2019. (KEK)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by Home Point Financial Corporation - Plaintiffs' responses are due on or before August 13, 2019; Defendant's reply, if any, is due on or before August 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/30/2019. (KEK)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/30/2019. (KEK)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Brief re #2 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment)(Pittman, Timothy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Home Point Financial Corp. (Pittman, Timothy)
July 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3391874 (ALND B4601099205) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Point Financial Corp from Circuit Court of St Clair County, Alabama, case number 59-cv-2019-900088, filed by Home Point Financial Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Pittman, Timothy) Modified on 7/18/2019 (KEK).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Point Financial Corp from Circuit Court of St Clair County, Alabama, case number 59-cv-2019-900088, filed by Home Point Financial Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otwell et al v. Home Point Financial Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Point Financial Corp
Represented By: Timothy P Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Otwell
Represented By: M Stan Herring, Jr
Represented By: John G Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danna Lee Otwell
Represented By: M Stan Herring, Jr
Represented By: John G Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?