Tidwell v. Social Security Administation, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Dena Tidwell
Defendant: Social Security Administation, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2019cv01124
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dena Tidwell. Social Security Administation, Commissioner served on 8/12/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (JLC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administation, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General- del to USM for service. (KWC)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/19/2019. (SRD)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dena Tidwell. (SRD)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE that the counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the plaintiff's social security number to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside of the CM/ECF filing system. (SRD)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administation, Commissioner, filed by Dena Tidwell.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Social Security Administation, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administation, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Tidwell
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?