Johnson v. BPS Direct LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jan Johnson
Defendant: BPS Direct LLC and White River Marine Group LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01142
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/12/2019. (SRD)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER terminating #6 Motion to Dismiss. The court hereby DEFERS ruling on BPS's motion until further discovery has been completed by the parties. The court grants BPS leave to file a renewed motion to dismiss or motion for summary judgment upon the completion of discovery in this matter. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/12/2019. (SRD)
September 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L Maze: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2019. (SRD)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The court SETS a telephone conference for Wednesday, September 11, 2019 at 1:30 PM. Call-in information will be emailed to all counsel of record. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/6/2019. (SRD)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant BPS Direct LLC re: #7 Brief filed by BPS Direct LLC. (Butler, M)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jan Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of W. Heath Brooks)(Brooks, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Corey L. Maze. Please use case number 4:19-cv-1142-CLM on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The undersigned recuses herself from further participation in this case. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to reassign this case to another judge in accordance with the Clerks normal procedure. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/20/2019. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER re 10 ORDER setting a Telephone Conference for August 27, 2019, 3:30 PM. The court VOIDS that Order and CANCELS the Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/20/19. (SAC)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** VOIDED per 11 ** TEXT ORDER - Telephone Conference set for August 27, 2019, 3:30 PM, Courtroom 6B, before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/20/19. (SAC ) Modified on 8/20/2019 (SAC ).
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by White River Marine Group LLC. filed by White River Marine Group LLC (Butler, M)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BPS Direct LLC. filed by BPS Direct LLC (Butler, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment . (Butler, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by BPS Direct LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Butler, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by White River Marine Group LLC.(Butler, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Johnson. White River Marine Group LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Brooks, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Johnson. BPS Direct LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Brooks, William)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BPS Direct LLC, White River Marine Group LLC. Returned to Plaintiff for service.(KEK)
July 19, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3394216 (ALND B4601099269) related document #1 COMPLAINT against BPS Direct LLC, White River Marine Group LLC, filed by Jan Johnson.(KEK). (Brooks, William) Modified on 7/22/2019 (KEK).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BPS Direct LLC, White River Marine Group LLC, filed by Jan Johnson.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. BPS Direct LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPS Direct LLC
Represented By: M Warren Butler
Represented By: Amber M Whillock
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White River Marine Group LLC
Represented By: M Warren Butler
Represented By: Amber M Whillock
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Johnson
Represented By: Michael K Timberlake
Represented By: William Heath Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?