Paudel v. Homan et al
Petitioner: Shankar Paudel
Respondent: Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan, Director of Etowah Detention Center and William P. Barr
Case Number: 4:2019cv01370
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The petitioner shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/1/2019. (SRD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William P. Barr, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan. filed by William P. Barr, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit North Declaration, #2 Exhibit Credible Fear Interview Record, #3 Exhibit Record of Negative Credible Fear Finding, #4 Exhibit Immigration Judge Order, #5 Exhibit Notice of Referral to Immigration Judge)(Marshall, Mary)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Respondents shall file their response to the order to show cause by 9/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/20/2019. (KAM)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by William P. Barr, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan. (Marshall, Mary)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William P. Barr, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan (Marshall, Mary)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/30/2019. (SRD)
August 30, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number H4601004184 Fee paid on 8/26/2019 in Huntsville Clerk's Office (KAM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. If Petitioner fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice, the court will dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G. Cornelius on 8/26/2019. (SRD)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shankar Poudel.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paudel v. Homan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shankar Paudel
Represented By: David Paul Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Homan
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of Etowah Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?