Trondheim Capital Partners LP et al v. Life Insurance Company of Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Trondheim Capital Partners LP and MTP 401K Plan
Defendant: Raymond Rudolph Renfrow, Jr., Marvin Lynn Lowe, Life Insurance Company of Alabama, Clarence William Daugette, III, Anne Daugette Renfrow, Rosalie Renfrow Causey and Alburta Daugette Low
Case Number: 4:2019cv01413
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MTP 401K Plan, Trondheim Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Sibley, Joseph)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. However, in light of the jurisdictional information in the Plaintiffs' response, the Court WILL GIVE LEAVE to Plaintiffs to Amend their Complaint on or before October 17, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/10/2019. (JLC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Show Cause Order filed by MTP 401K Plan, Trondheim Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit EXHIBIT A, #2 Affidavit EXHIBIT B, #3 Affidavit EXHIBIT C)(Sibley, Joseph)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by F Michael Haney on behalf of All Defendants (Haney, F)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before October 2, 2019, why the Court should not dismiss their complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/24/2019. (JLC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rosalie Renfrow Causey, Clarence William Daugette, III, Life Insurance Company of Alabama, Alburta Daugette Low, Marvin Lynn Lowe, Anne Daugette Renfrow, Raymond Rudolph Renfrow, Jr. (Dauphin, Charles)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trondheim Capital Partners LP. Marvin Lynn Lowe served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (KAM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trondheim Capital Partners LP. Anne Daugette Renfrow served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Raymond Rudolph Renfrow, Jr served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (JLC)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trondheim Capital Partners LP. Rosalie Renfrow Causey served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; Alburta Daugette Low served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (JLC)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Joseph David Sibley IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is advised that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 08/30/2019. (ALD)
August 30, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Joseph David Sibley, IV in the amount of $75.00, receipt number B4601100248. (JLC)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph David Sibley IV by Trondheim Capital Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fancher, Sharonda)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rosalie Renfrow Causey, Clarence William Daugette, III, Life Insurance Company of Alabama, Alburta Daugette Low, Marvin Lynn Lowe, Anne Daugette Renfrow, Raymond Rudolph Renfrow, Jr. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 29th day of August, 2019. (JLC)
August 29, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3423051, NDAL receipt #B4601100206.(Fancher, Sharonda) Modified on 8/29/2019 (JLC).
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by MTP 401K Plan, Trondheim Capital Partners LP. (Fancher, Sharonda)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Trondheim Capital Partners LP, MTP 401K Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trondheim Capital Partners LP et al v. Life Insurance Company of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Rudolph Renfrow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Lynn Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence William Daugette, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Daugette Renfrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalie Renfrow Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alburta Daugette Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trondheim Capital Partners LP
Represented By: Sharonda Childs Fancher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTP 401K Plan
Represented By: Sharonda Childs Fancher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?