Lott v. Foremost Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Trudy Lott
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Co
Case Number: 4:2019cv01441
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L Maze: Scheduling Conference held on 10/17/2019. (SRD)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain time limits apply as set out herein. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2020. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Status Conference set for 6/10/2020 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL before Judge Corey L Maze. Motions due by 7/13/2020. Exhibit List due by 11/6/2020. Witness List due by 11/6/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL before Judge Corey L Maze. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Corey L Maze. All dispositive motions filed in this action, and all responses thereto, must comply with all requirements of Appendix II to this Court's Uniform Initial Order, attached hereto for the parties convenience. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(JLC)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Defendant's #12 MOTION to Continue Hearing or Permission to Appear Telephonically is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference in this case has been rescheduled for Thursday 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in the US Courthouse, 1129 Noble Street, Anniston, AL before Judge Corey L. Maze. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/30/2019. (SRD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue HEARING OR PERMISSION TO ATTEND TELEPHONICALLY by Foremost Insurance Co. (Clement, Kori)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference set for Thursday 10/3/2019 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, 1129 Noble Street, Anniston, AL before Judge Corey L. Maze. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/26/2019. (SRD)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/26/2019. (SRD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clement, Kori)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Corey L Maze. Please use case number 4:19-cv-1441-CLM on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. The status conference set for September 18, 2019 is CANCELLED. (MRR, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:15 a.m. on September 18, 2019. (Doc. #5 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/16/2019. (MSN)
September 16, 2019 REMOVED Doc 7- RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Foremost by Trudy Lott.(French, Robert)-L.R 5.3 NON FILING OF DISCOVERY COURT. (MRR, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/4/19. (MRR, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 18, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after October 18, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on September 18, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/4/19. (MRR, )
September 3, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601100259 (MRR, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Foremost Insurance Co.(Clement, Kori)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foremost Insurance Co. filed by Foremost Insurance Co (Clement, Kori)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foremost Insurance Co from Circuit Court of DeKalb County, case number 28-cv-2019-900240., filed by Foremost Insurance Co.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott v. Foremost Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Co
Represented By: Kori L Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Lott
Represented By: Robert B French, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?