CALERO v. HORTHAN
Petitioner: Francisco Alberto Calero
Respondent: Jonathan Horthan and John Tsoukaris
Case Number: 4:2019cv01475
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:19-cv-17255. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Respondent John Tsoukaris is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall add Jonathan Horthan as a Respondent; and the Clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, etc**** Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/4/2019. (vm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/5/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW040391.), filed by FRANCISCO ALBERTO CALERO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALERO v. HORTHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francisco Alberto Calero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathan Horthan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Tsoukaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?