Hunter v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Ouster Hunter
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2019cv01526
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ouster Hunter. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 9/30/2019, answer due 12/29/2019. (JLC)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to the Social Security Administration, Commissioner delivered to the USM for service on this the 17th day of September, 2019. (JLC)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/16/19. (MMW)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ouster Hunter. (KEK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Ouster Hunter.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ouster Hunter
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?