Love v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Ray Love, Jr
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, LVNV Funding LLC, Trans Union LLC, World Acceptance Corporation, Credit One Bank NA and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01954
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Young, L)
January 31, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Reid, Kirkland)
January 30, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #18 Plaintiff Love's Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendants. Credit One Bank NA and World Acceptance Corporation are dismissed without prejudice and terminated as parties in this case. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/24/2020. (SRD)
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC, filed by Charles Ray Love, Jr.(Adkins, Micah)
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Credit One Bank, N.A. and World Acceptance Corporation (Only) by Charles Ray Love, Jr. filed by Charles Ray Love, Jr (Adkins, Micah)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles Ray Love, Jr. Credit One Bank NA waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Adkins, Micah)
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc. filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc (Young, L)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Young, L)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. filed by Trans Union LLC (Robinett, Matthew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC. filed by Equifax Information Services LLC (Reid, Kirkland)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Reid, Kirkland)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/20/2019. (SRD)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding LLC. filed by LVNV Funding LLC (Moore, Neal)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by LVNV Funding LLC.(Moore, Neal)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Ray Love, Jr. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020; Trans Union LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (AKD)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Ray Love, Jr. Credit One Bank NA served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (KAM)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Ray Love, Jr. LVNV Funding LLC served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020; World Acceptance Corporation served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020. (AKD)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Ray Love, Jr. Experian Information Solutions Inc served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020. (AKD)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit One Bank NA, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, LVNV Funding LLC, Trans Union LLC, World Acceptance Corporation mailed certified mail. (AKD)
December 4, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3489713 (ALND receipt# B4601102441). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Ray Love, Jr.(SRD). (Adkins, Micah) Modified on 12/4/2019 (AKD, ).
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Charles Ray Love, Jr. (Adkins, Micah)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Ray Love, Jr.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: L Jackson Young, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By: Neal D Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Matthew Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Kirkland E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ray Love, Jr
Represented By: Micah S Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?