Williams v. Horton et al
Petitioner: Randane Williams, Sarail Michael Archilla, Ray Fuller, Roger Allen Olano Esparza, Landry Mbendeke, Kenneth Manning, Churvin Webster, Karim Tahir Golding, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Sergio Quito, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Bakhodir Madjitov, Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Maxime P Blanc, Edson Flores, Tesfa Miller and Antonio Melquezideth Castro
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Chad F Wolf, Jonathon Horton, George H Lund, III, William Barr, Keith Peek and Immigration and Customs Enfocement
Case Number: 4:2020cv00304
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 22 ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** EXHIBIT 13 (JLC)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, GRANTING #17 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document. Accordingly, #10 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief is STRICKEN. The Clerk is DIRECTED to open a new, separate case for the #11 Corrected Amended Complaint, with the exception of the claims raised in Williams' original petition. All of the pro hac vice admissions entered after the Corrected Amended Complaint, docs. 12 15, 18 20, should be transferred to the new case. The Petitioners are DIRECTED to refile their motion in the newly opened case after paying the applicable filing fee or applying for pauperis status.As for Williams original petition, he has until May 7, 2020, to file additional materials in support of his Zadvydas and non-COVID-19-based claims. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/29/2020. (JLC)
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Roger Allen Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Corrected Exhibits 20 & 21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 (Corrected) - Declaration of Ellen Eaton, #2 Exhibit 21 (Corrected) - Declaration of Susan Hassig)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 29, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3580811 (B4601105608). (Shebaya, Sirine) Modified on 4/29/2020 (MRR, ).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney Jeremy Jong, but with the understanding and on the condition he pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless he has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/29/2020. (AVC)
April 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Roger Allen Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeremy Jong)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 28, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Roger Allen Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Roger Allen Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Jessica Myers Vosburgh, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Randane Williams, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Sarail Michael Archilla, #5 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Maxime P. Blanc, #6 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, #7 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Antonio Melquezideth Castro, #8 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Edson Flores, #9 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Ray Fuller, #10 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, #11 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Karim Tahir Golding, #12 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Alex Hernandez, #13 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Bakhodir Madjitov, #14 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Kenneth Manning, #15 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Landry (Emily) Mbendeke, #16 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Tesfa Miller, #17 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Allen Roger Olano Esparza, #18 Exhibit 16 - Declartion of Sergio Quito, #19 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Joseph Debonnaire Soho, #20 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Churvin Webster, #21 Exhibit 19 - Declaration of Dr. Jaimie Meyer, #22 Exhibit 20 - Declaration of Dr. Ellen Eaton, #23 Exhibit 21 - Declaration of Susan Hassig, #24 Exhibit 22 - Federal Court Orders & Opinions)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney Shebaya Sirine, but with the understanding and on the condition she pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless she has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/28/2020. (AVC)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Roger Allen Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sirine Shebaya)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney Matthew Vogel, but with the understanding and on the condition he pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless he has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/28/2020. (AVC)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarail Michael Archilla, Maxime P Blanc, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Edson Flores, Ray Fuller, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Karim Tahir Golding, Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Bakhodir Madjitov, Kenneth Manning, Landry Mbendeke, Tesfa Miller, Roger Allen Olano Esparza, Sergio Quito, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Churvin Webster, Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew S. Vogel)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 27, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3579429 (ALND B4601105598). (Vogel, Matthew) Modified on 4/28/2020 (KEK).
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT [CORRECTED] against Matthew Albence, William Barr, Jonathon Horton, Immigration and Customs Enfocement, George H Lund, III, Keith Peek, Chad F Wolf, filed by Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Tesfa Miller, Maxime P Blanc, Kenneth Manning, Roger Allen Olano Esparza, Randane Williams, Ray Fuller, Edson Flores, Churvin Webster, Sarail Michael Archilla, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Bakhodir Madjitov, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Sergio Quito, Karim Tahir Golding, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Landry Mbendeke, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera.(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew Albence, William Barr, Jonathon Horton, George H Lund, III, Keith Peek, Chad F Wolf, Immigration and Customs Enfocement, filed by Randane Williams, Sergio Quito, Landry Mbendeke, Geovanny Gerardo Castellano, Tesfa Miller, Churvin Webster, Joseph Debonnaire Soho, Antonio Melquezideth Castro, Bakhodir Madjitov, Maxime P Blanc, Edson Flores, Alex Giovanni Hernandez, Karim Tahir Golding, Kenneth Manning, Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera, Sarail Michael Archilla, Ray Fuller, Roger Allen Olano Esparza.(Vosburgh, Jessica)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER notifying Petitioner that Respondents' #8 Motion seeking Dismissal of the #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus will be treated by the Court as a Motion for Summary Judgment, and to further inform the Petitioner of his right to file affidavits or other materials in opposition to the Motion, and of the consequences of default. Petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date this Order is entered to respond. Thereafter, the Petition will be taken under submission by the Court and an Order entered thereon without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/16/2020. (JLC)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by Matthew Albence, William Barr, George H Lund, III, Chad F Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Pitman Decl.)(Cheek, Jason)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of Matthew Albence, William Barr, George H Lund, III, Chad F Wolf (Cheek, Jason)
March 16, 2020 PHV Fee paid for Khaled Alrabe in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3557574, NDAL receipt #B4601104875. (Alrabe, Khaled) Modified on 3/16/2020 (JLC).
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Khaled Alrabe on behalf of Randane Williams (Alrabe, Khaled)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; It is hereby ORDERED that Respondents APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/11/2020. (JLC)
March 10, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601104725. (JLC)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING; Petitioner's pleading is deficient for the reasons indicated. Petitioner must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order in the manner explained herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/6/2020. (JLC)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney Khaled Alrabe, but with the understanding and on the condition he pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless he has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 03/06/2020. (CLS2)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Khaled Alrabe by Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Khaled Alrabe)(Vosburgh, Jessica)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Randane Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F Wolf
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathon Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George H Lund, III
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enfocement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randane Williams
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sarail Michael Archilla
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ray Fuller
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roger Allen Olano Esparza
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Landry Mbendeke
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Manning
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Churvin Webster
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karim Tahir Golding
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Debonnaire Soho
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sergio Quito
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Geovanny Gerardo Castellano
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bakhodir Madjitov
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex Giovanni Hernandez
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Antonio Garcia Rivera
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maxime P Blanc
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edson Flores
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tesfa Miller
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Melquezideth Castro
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Represented By: Matthew Scott Vogel
Represented By: Jeremy Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?