Hussen v. Warden et al
Petitioner: Ali Asfeday Hussen
Respondent: Warden and William Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv00360
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Petitioner has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to respond. Thereafter, the petition will be taken under advisement by the Court, and the undersigned will enter a report and recommendation without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/15/2020. (KEK)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause, dated March 18, 2020 filed by William Barr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan S. Pitman)(Richardson, Clinton)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents' answer to the show cause order is due May 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 04/30/2020. (CLS2)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause, dated March 18, 2020 by William Barr. (Richardson, Clinton)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Richardson on behalf of William Barr (Richardson, Clinton)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William Barr (Marshall, Mary)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ali Asfeday Hussen. (JLC)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Petitioner Ali Asfeday Hussen has filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Doc. #1 ). Petitioner is presently confined in Etowah County Detention Center. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Respondent appear and show cause in writing within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/18/2020. (KEK)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ALND B46010044374), filed by Ali Asfeday Hussen.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussen v. Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ali Asfeday Hussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?