Zeresenay v. Warden et al
Petitioner: Melacke Zeresenay
Respondent: William Barr and Warden
Case Number: 4:2020cv00361
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause dated March 19,2020 filed by William Barr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan S. Pitman)(Richardson, Clinton)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents shall have until May 15, 2020 to respond to the Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/11/2020. (SRD)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause dated March 19,2020 by William Barr. (Richardson, Clinton)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Richardson on behalf of William Barr (Richardson, Clinton)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William Barr (Marshall, Mary)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William Barr (Marshall, Mary)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melacke Zeresenay (MRR, )
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 3/19/2020. (SRD)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 H4601004438.), filed by Melacke Zeresenay.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeresenay v. Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melacke Zeresenay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?