Ali v. Barr
Petitioner: Ilyas Ali
Respondent: William Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv00363
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER notifying Petitioner that Respondent filed a #7 Response to the petition in the above-styled case in which they seek to have the petition summarily dismissed without an evidentiary hearing and to further inform the Petitioner of his right to file affidavits or other materials in opposition to the response and of the possible consequences of not responding. Petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to respond. Thereafter, the petition will be taken under advisement by the Court, and the undersigned will enter a Report and Recommendation without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/7/2020. (JLC, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to the U.S. Attorney's #7 Allegations filed by Ilyas Ali. (JLC)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to re #2 filed by William Barr. (Attachments: #1 Pitman Decl.)(Cheek, Jason)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FINDING AS MOOT #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Respondent is DIRECTED to Answer the #1 Petition, consistent with the previous #2 Order To Show Cause by April 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 SDNY Docket Sheet)(JLC)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by Ilyas Ali. (KAM)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by William Barr. (Cheek, Jason)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of William Barr (Cheek, Jason)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; The Respondent is hereby ORDERED to APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/17/2020. (JLC)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing Fee $5.00 receipt #B4601104884), filed by Ilyas Ali.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ilyas Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?