Reyes v. Wolf et al
Case Number: 4:2020cv00524
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Petitioner has 21 days from the date of this order to file a respond to respondents motion to dismiss case as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/10/2020. (AHI)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gregory Archambeault, William Pelham Barr, Chad F. Wolf. filed by Gregory Archambeault, William Pelham Barr, Chad F. Wolf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pitman Declaration)(Marshall, Mary)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The #5 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and respondents have until 6/10/2020 to file their response. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/9/2020. (AHI )
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Gregory Archambeault, William Pelham Barr, Chad F. Wolf. (Marshall, Mary)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of Gregory Archambeault, William Pelham Barr, Chad F. Wolf (Marshall, Mary)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Richardson on behalf of Gregory Archambeault, William Pelham Barr, Chad F. Wolf (Richardson, Clinton)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Respondent is ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing within 30 days why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/7/2020. (AHI )
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5; Receipt Number: H4601004453) filed by Jose Alfredo Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?