Crane v. Brennan
Plaintiff: Sylvia E. Crane
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 4:2020cv00572
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Ward on behalf of Megan J. Brennan (Ward, Carla)
May 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia E. Crane. Megan J. Brennan served on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/11/2020. (Strawn, Ralph)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Megan J. Brennan. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
April 27, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3579476 (ALND Reciept# B4601105599). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Megan J. Brennan, filed by Sylvia E. Crane.(SRD). (Strawn, Ralph) Modified on 4/28/2020 (AKD).
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Megan J. Brennan, filed by Sylvia E. Crane.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crane v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Represented By: Carla Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia E. Crane
Represented By: John T Robertson, IV
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?