Jelks v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Charlotte Jelks
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv00674
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 6/4/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (BJL)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to USMS for service as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/15/2020. (AHI)
May 13, 2020 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system.(AHI )
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlotte Jelks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IFP)(AHI)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Charlotte Jelks.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jelks v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Jelks
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?