Brewer v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Angela Brewer
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv00714
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Brewer. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 6/18/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (KAM)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Kathleen Fishel on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Fishel, Shannon)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General del to USM (KAM)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/28/2020. (KAM)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Brewer. (Attachments: #1 IFP Affidavit)(KEK)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Angela Brewer.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Brewer
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?