Thompson v. Barr
Petitioner: Richard Marvin Thompson
Respondent: William Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv00727
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
2 Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION-Based on the foregoing the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Respondents unopposed motion to dismiss be GRANTED and the petition be DISMISSED as MOOT. The petitioner must file any objections with the Clerk of Court within fourteen (14) calendar days from the date the report and recommendation is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 06/19/2020. (AKD)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #3 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss as moot (released) [CORRECTED] by William Barr. filed by William Barr (Wilson, Sarah)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Notice #2 sent to Richard Marvin Thompson (AKD)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss as moot (released) by William Barr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Pitman Declaration)(Wilson, Sarah)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Abdul K Kallon. Judge Corey L Maze no longer assigned to the case. (SRD)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Richard Marvin Thompson. *Transferred from USCA First Circuit* (Attachments: #1 USCA Transfer Letter)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Marvin Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?