Russell et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mellissia Russell and Greg Russell
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00752
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TEXT ORDER - The court sets a Motion Hearing set for October 22, 2020, 09:30 AM, Courtroom 6B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/23/20. (SAC)
July 6, 2020 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #82 MOTION to Strike #27 Miscellaneous Document, #11 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Clear Flags,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feldman, Andrew)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER denying #86 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/6/2020. (RLW)
July 6, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Strike Defendants' Experts That Exceed The Five (5) Expert Limit as set forth in the governing pre-trial order, PTO #328, and to limit Defendants employees from offering expert opinions, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Strike Defendants' Experts That Exceed The Five (5) Expert Limit as set forth in the governing pre-trial order, PTO #328, and to limit Defendants employees from offering expert opinions)(Feldman, Andrew)
June 29, 2020 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Strike #27 Miscellaneous Document, #11 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Clear Flags,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walker, Caroline)
June 15, 2020 Set Hearings: Jury Trial set to begin 2/1/2021, 9:00 AM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. (SAC)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is #82 MOTION to Strike, filed by Mellissia Russell and Greg Russell. The defendants' response is due on or before June 29, 2020; a reply, if any, is due on or before July 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/15/20. (SAC)
June 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2020. Present were Lawrence Holcomb, Andrew Feldman, Jacob Flint, Caroline Walker, and Chris Berdy.Written order to follow. (SAC)
June 12, 2020 Filing 83 Brief re #82 MOTION to Strike #27 Miscellaneous Document, #11 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Clear Flags,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Feldman, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION to Strike #27 Miscellaneous Document, #11 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Clear Flags,,,,,,,,,,, by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Feldman, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TEXT ORDER granting Aaron K. Dickey and Sara E. Coopwood's #80 motion to withdraw as attorneys. Attorneys Sara E. Coopwood and Aaron K. Dickey terminated. Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by Lawrence K. Holcomb, Jacob A. Flint, and Andrew J. Feldman. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/11/2020. (RLW)
June 10, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Feldman, Andrew)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ORDER - The court sets a Telephone Conference for June 15, 2020, 11:15 AM, before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. The parties will receive the numbers required to join the call by e-mail from the court. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/10/20. (SAC)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is #76 Amended MOTION for Limited Admission of Jacob Flint, by Greg Russell & Mellissia Russell. The court GRANTS the motion. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/10/20. (SAC)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is #75 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Feldman, by Greg Russell & Mellissia Russell. The court GRANTS the motion. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/10/20. (SAC)
June 8, 2020 Filing 76 Amended MOTION for Limited Admission by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Flint, Jacob)
June 8, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Feldman, Andrew)
June 8, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence King Holcomb on behalf of Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell (Holcomb, Lawrence)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ORDER denying #71 motion to proceed pro hac vice. Attorney Feldman has not complied with this court's requirement to designate local counsel. See N.D. Al. L.R. 83.1(b)(2). Although Mr. Feldman asserts that the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation permit him to proceed without designating local counsel, the rule he cites applies only to proceedings transferred to the multidistrict litigation panel under 28 U.S.C. 1407, not to proceedings held in this court after a transfer from the multidistrict litigation panel under 28 U.S.C. 1404. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/4/20. (SAC)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TEXT ORDER denying #70 motion to proceed pro hac vice. Attorney Flint has not complied with this court's requirement to designate local counsel. See N.D. Al. L.R. 83.1(b)(2). Although Mr. Flint asserts that the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation permit him to proceed without designating local counsel, the rule he cites applies only to proceedings transferred to the multidistrict litigation panel under 28 U.S.C. 1407, not to proceedings held in this court after a transfer from the multidistrict litigation panel under 28 U.S.C. 1404. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/4/20. (SAC)
June 4, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3603106. (Feldman, Andrew)
June 4, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Limited Admission by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Feldman, Andrew)
June 4, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for Limited Admission for Pro Hac Vice by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flint, Jacob)
June 4, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3602976. (Flint, Jacob)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiffs' counsel, Aaron K. Dickey, Andrew J. Feldman, Jacob A. Flint, Lawrence King Holcomb, and Sara E. Coopwood, are not admitted to practice in this court. On or before June 8, 2020, counsel shall file pro hac vice motions that comply with Local Rule 83.1(b). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/1/2020. (RLW)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TEXT ORDER granting #67 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorneys Christopher D. Morris; Susan M. Robinson; David B. Thomas; Rebecca Lee Wiggs; James C Barton, Jr.; and William M. Gage terminated. Attorneys Christopher S. Berdy and Caroline D. Walker will continue to represent Defendants Ethicon, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/29/2020. (RLW)
May 29, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David B. Thomas, Rebecca Lee Wiggs, Susan M. Robinson, Christopher D. Morris, James C. Barton, Jr., and William M. Gage by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Caroline)
May 29, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S Berdy on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Berdy, Christopher)
May 29, 2020 Filing 65 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-02730. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 26, 2020 Filing 64 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2650) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Christina Pramudji, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2664) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2668) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2670) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Stephen Factor, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2682) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Jaime L. Sepulveda-Toro, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2698) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2710) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2717) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Ralph Zipper, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2723) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3299) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motionre Ralph Zipper, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3508) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Christina Pramudji, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3529) Order - Motion to Strike Supplemental Report re Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3534) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Jaime L. Sepulveda-Toro, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3546) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3563) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (4171) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (4180) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Peggy Pence, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (4186) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (4200) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Jaime L. Sepulveda-Toro, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (4201) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Shelby Thames, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (4220) Order - Motion to Strike Supplemental Report re Shelby Thames, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (6270) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Jaime L. Sepulveda-Toro, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (6357) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Marshall Shoemaker, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (6401) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Scott Guelcher, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (6519) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Bruce Rosenzweig, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (8902) Order - Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Rule 26 Disclosures)(Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 63 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8557) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8644) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 62 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (4328) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (4329) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4551) Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8510) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8640) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 61 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2014) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2018) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2138) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jamie Sepulveda-Toro, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2138) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jamie Sepulveda-Toro, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2138) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jamie Sepulveda-Toro, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2225) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2453) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime L. Sepulveda-Toro, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2508) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2508) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2508) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2612) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime L. Sepulveda-Toro, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2929) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4495) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8509) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8646) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 60 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2035) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2037) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2153) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2236) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2530) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8501) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8614) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Christina Pramudji)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 59 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2015) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2020) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2135) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2135) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2256) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8480) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot of Stephen Factor, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8621) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Stephen Factor)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 58 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2068) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2072) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2190) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2221) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2418) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (5076) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (5077) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (5124) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (5178) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Ralph Zipper, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8553) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply Briefs of Ralph Zipper, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8606) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp of Ralph Zipper)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 57 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8541) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8599) - Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 56 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 55 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8531) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8596) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp of Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 54 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8076) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8322) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8512) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8585) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 53 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 52 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #51 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8511) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8584) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 51 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/28/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/27/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY BRIEF by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell to #45 Response In Opposition. (Feldman, Andrew) (Modified on 9/6/2019 to remove link to #42 motion) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 48 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #46 Response In Opposition,. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 47 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #44 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell in opposition to #41 Memorandum In Support, #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #42 MOTION by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Christina Pramudji, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell in opposition to #38 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell in support of #42 MOTION by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Christina Pramudji, M.D.. (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Christina Pramudji, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #38 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 37 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #35 Notice to Take Videotape Deposition of Christina Klein Pramudji, MD. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sara E. Coopwood on behalf of Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Coopwood, Sara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell of Dr. Christina Klein Pramudji on August 7, 2019 at 10:00 am CST (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aaron K. Dickey on behalf of Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Dickey, Aaron) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Rebecca Lee Wiggs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Wiggs, Rebecca) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #31 Notice of Deposition of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 8/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 8/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Robert Raymond on July 18, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. CDT (Barton, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James C. Barton, Jr on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Barton, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell for Amended Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures and Case Specific Expert Report. (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell for Expert Witness Disclosures and Expert Report. (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions. (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence King Holcomb on behalf of Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Holcomb, Lawrence) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS to #17 Notice of Deposition of Greg Russell by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS to #16 Notice of Deposition of Mellissia Russell by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Feldman on behalf of Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell for Responses to Ethicon, Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell for First Sets of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Greg Russell on 05/14/2019 at 2:00 p.m. CDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mellissia Russell on 05/14/2019 at 10:00 a.m. CDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #14 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Incorrect image filed. CORRECTION: Incorrect image removed; see entry #15. (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Walker, Caroline) (Modified on 3/13/2019 to convert event to certificate of service) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 INCORRECT IMAGE; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 3/13/2019 to remove incorrect image; see entry #15) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christopher D. Morris on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Morris, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Caroline Dye Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc.. (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4421 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Greg Russell, Mellissia Russell. (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 25, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 23, 2016 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 220 (Initial Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 03/18/2016 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 22, 2016 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4484511. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mellissia Russell
Represented By: Jacob A Flint
Represented By: Aaron K. Dickey
Represented By: Andrew J. Feldman
Represented By: Lawrence King Holcomb
Represented By: Sara E. Coopwood
Represented By: Jacob Alex Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Russell
Represented By: Jacob A Flint
Represented By: Aaron K. Dickey
Represented By: Andrew J. Feldman
Represented By: Lawrence King Holcomb
Represented By: Sara E. Coopwood
Represented By: Jacob Alex Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: James C Barton, Jr
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christopher S Berdy
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Rebecca Lee Wiggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: James C Barton, Jr
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christopher S Berdy
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Rebecca Lee Wiggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?