Alfa Mutual Insurance Company v. Crowder et al
Plaintiff: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Benchmark Rehabilitation Partners, LLC, Town of Altoona, AL, Advantage Emergency Medical Services, LLC, United States of America, Department of Health and Human Services, Northeast Imaging, P.C., Pediatric Radiology Associates, P.C., Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Gadsden, LLC, Birmingham Radiological Group, P.C., Riverview Regional Medical Center, LLC, The Orthopedic Center LLC, Anesthesia Associates, P.A., Blue Cross and Blue Sheild of Alabama, Bryan Crowder, Sparks Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, Armando Quizon, MD, Ralph Wesley, Jr MD, The Children's Hospital of Alabama, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, MCT, Inc., Prime Healthcare Services - Gadsden, LLC, Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC, MCT, Inc. doing business as Pysicians Home Health Superstore, Town of Altoona, AL doing business as A-Med Ambulance Service and APP of Alabama ED, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00777
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 30 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Riverview Regional Medical Center LLC (Doc 17). (KEK)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER The court has received Defendant Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLCs Motion to Set Aside Default (doc. #28 ). The court ORDERS the parties to file any objections to this motion by August 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/31/2020. (SRD)
July 30, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC. (Reynolds, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 27 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company as to Northeast Imaging, P.C.. (KEK)
July 29, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Interpleader) by Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC.(Reynolds, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert DeLoach Reynolds on behalf of Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC (Reynolds, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 24 Alias Summons Issued as to Birmingham Radiological Group, P.C., MCT, Inc., Northeast Imaging, P.C., Pediatric Radiology Associates, P.C. delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Anesthesia Associates, P.A. C/o Tome Pike; Entry of Default returned (MEB2)
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company as to Birmingham Radiological Group, P.C.. (KEK)
July 16, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company Advantage Emergency Medical Services LLC served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/06/2020 (no date on green card) (AKD)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER GRANTING United States, Dept. of Health and Human Services' Second Motion for Extension of Time (doc. #12 ). The federal defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading is now August 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/15/2020. (SRD)
July 15, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company as to MCT, Inc.. (KEK)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ABILITY TO REQUEST PRO BONO COUNSEL as to APP of Alabama ED, LLC, Anesthesia Associates, P.A., Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Gadsden, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Prime Healthcare Services - Gadsden, LLC, Armando Quizon, MD, Riverview Regional Medical Center, LLC, The Orthopedic Center LLC, Town of Altoona, AL (Attachments: #1 Application for Legal Assistance Federal Civil Po Bono Program, #2 Client Financial Verification Form Federal Civil Pro Bono Program)(SRD)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to APP of Alabama ED, LLC, Anesthesia Associates, P.A., Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Gadsden, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Prime Healthcare Services - Gadsden, LLC, Armando Quizon, MD, Riverview Regional Medical Center, LLC, The Orthopedic Center LLC, Town of Altoona, AL (SRD)
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company as to Ralph Wesley, Jr MD. (KEK)
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company. Sparks Orthopedics & Sports served 7/8/20, answer due 7/29/20. Benchmark Rehabilitation Partners served 7/9/20, answer due 7/30/20. (KEK)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Advantage Emergency Medical Services, LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 Request for service by certified mail filed by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company. (Rice, Dana)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America, Department of Health and Human Services. (Richardson, Clinton)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Benchmark Rehabilitation Partners, LLC, Birmingham Radiological Group, P.C., MCT, Inc., Northeast Imaging, P.C., Pediatric Radiology Associates, P.C., Sparks Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, Ralph Wesley, Jr MD. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 Request for service by certified mail filed by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company. (Rice, Dana)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Town of Altoona, AL dba A-Med Ambulance Service; Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC; AP of Alabama Ed, LLC; Anesthesia Associates, PA; Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Gadsden, LLC; The Orthopedic Center, LLC; Riverview Regional Medical Center, LLC; Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC; Armando Quizon, M.D.; and Prime Healthcare Services-Gadsden, LLC by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company. (Rice, Dana) Modified docket text only on 7/15/2020 (SRD).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/25/2020. (SRD)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader and Statement of Claim by Blue Cross and Blue Sheild of Alabama.(Sessions, Samuel)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Ganey Adams on behalf of Bryan Crowder(as father and next friend to Zachary Crowder) (Adams, Erin)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Ganey Adams on behalf of Bryan Crowder(as father and next friend of Eli Crowder) (Adams, Erin)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Ganey Adams on behalf of Bryan Crowder(individually) (Adams, Erin)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER GRANTING United States, Dept. of Health and Human Services' Motion for Extension of Time (doc. #2 ). The federal defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading is now July 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/5/2020. (SRD)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America, Department of Health and Human Services. (Richardson, Clinton)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America, Department of Health and Human Services from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-CV-2020-900258.00. (SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company v. Crowder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Rehabilitation Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Altoona, AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Emergency Medical Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Imaging, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pediatric Radiology Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Gadsden, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham Radiological Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverview Regional Medical Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Orthopedic Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anesthesia Associates, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Sheild of Alabama
Represented By: Samuel T Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Crowder
Represented By: Erin Ganey Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparks Orthopedics & Sports Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Quizon, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Wesley, Jr MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Children's Hospital of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Robert DeLoach Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Healthcare Services - Gadsden, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drayer Physical Therapy Institute, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCT, Inc. doing business as Pysicians Home Health Superstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Altoona, AL doing business as A-Med Ambulance Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APP of Alabama ED, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana L Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?