James v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Latoya Tonyette James
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2020cv00937
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Latoya Tonyette James. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 7/21/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (KEK)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court grants plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. #2 ). The Clerk is directed to file this action without prepayment of a fee. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/2/2020. (YMB)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Latoya Tonyette James. (Attachments: #1 IFP Affidavit)(KEK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Latoya Tonyette James.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Tonyette James
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?