Brown v. Flores et al
Petitioner: Daniel Brown
Respondent: William Barr, Angela Hoover, Simona Flores and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 4:2020cv01126
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Respondents represent that Petitioner was released from ICE custody on September 10, 2020; Accordingly, Petitioner's habeas corpus petition #1 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/10/2020. (KAM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Simona Flores. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan S. Pitman)(Richardson, Clinton)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to transfer case to Louisiana by Daniel Brown. (KAM)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time by William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Simona Flores. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan S. Pitman)(Richardson, Clinton)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE - Request to deny Respondent's request for an order to show cause on 42:1983 civil action pending in Pennsylvania for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and in the event deny Respondent's request to stay briefing as a tactis to render petitioner's pending 28:2241 moot by Daniel Brown (KAM)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Responses due by 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/26/2020. (KAM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Simona Flores. (Richardson, Clinton)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Simona Flores. (Richardson, Clinton)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Richardson on behalf of William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Simona Flores (Richardson, Clinton)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - the respondents shall appear and show cause in writing within 20 days why the relief requested should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/7/2020. (KAM) (KAM, ).
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-01089. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer. 2.The clerk of court is directed to transfer Browns Emergency Relief for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Doc. 1), to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. 3.The clerk of court is also directed to close this caseSigned by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/5/20 (bs) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail (30-Day Administrative Order) sent to Daniel Brown (ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #4 sent to Daniel Brown (ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Receipt of payment from DANIEL BROWN in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 7/16/2020. Receipt number 111025749 processed by bdanilow. (jjs) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Supplement by Daniel Brown to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case. (mfa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Daniel Brown.(mfa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Brown (mfa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 06/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Requesting for ICE to submit Affidavit Explaining What Procedure ICE Follows in Making the Decision to Detain Brown on March 4, 2020. by Daniel Brown.(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY Relief for 28 USC 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Daniel Brown.(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Flores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angela Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?