King v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Larry King
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company and Randy Jones & Associates
Case Number: 4:2020cv01201
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Stay #12 . All deadlines are stayed pending Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #8 . Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/25/2020. (SRD)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay by Larry King. (Glover, R)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to re #8 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Larry King. (Glover, R)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to re #9 Show Cause Order filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - RBC Estimate, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2017 Farm Declarations Page, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018 Farm Declarations Page, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2019 Farm Declarations Page, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2020 Farm Declarations Page)(Johnson, John)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, September 16, 2020 why the court should not grant King's Motion to Remand #8 due to failure to meet the amount in controversy set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/3/2020. (SRD)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Larry King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Glover, R)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.(Johnson, John)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/20/2020. (SRD)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Randy Jones & Associates. filed by Randy Jones & Associates (Smythe, Gage)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan S Jones on behalf of Randy Jones & Associates (Jones, Allan)
August 19, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601107892 (AKD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Randy Jones & Associates.(Smythe, Gage)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Randy Jones & Associates re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Smythe, Gage)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Marshall County, case number 50-CV-2020-900236. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry King
Represented By: Randy H Beard
Represented By: P J Harris, II
Represented By: R Matt Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: John W Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Jones & Associates
Represented By: Gage Cooper Smythe
Represented By: Allan S Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?