Huffman v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Jean Huffman
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officers, Jefferson Dunn, Cedric Specks, Edward Ellington, Russell Jones, Gary Malone, Gwendolyn Givens, Karla Jones, Phillip Dixon, Grantt Culliver, Anthony Brooks, CO1 Rafael Santa-Maria, Warden II DeWayne Estes, Kevin White and Unknown Shift Commanders
Case Number: 4:2020cv01293
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 27 Alias Summons Issued as to Anthony Brooks, Karla Jones, Cedric Specks. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #25 . Plaintiff will now have until November 10, 2020 to response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Motion for More Definite Statement #19 . Accordingly, Defendants have until November 24, 2020 to reply. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 10/27/2020. (SRD)
October 26, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Gibson, Laura)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Carrie Jean Huffman as to DeWayne Estes. (MEB2)
October 14, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Northcutt on behalf of Grantt Culliver, Phillip Dixon, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, DeWayne Estes, Gwendolyn Givens, Russell Jones, Gary Malone, Kevin White (Northcutt, Robert)
October 14, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jackson Britton on behalf of Grantt Culliver, Phillip Dixon, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, DeWayne Estes, Gwendolyn Givens, Russell Jones, Gary Malone, Kevin White (Britton, William)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: the Court SETS the following briefing schedule regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Motion for More Definite Statement #19 : Plaintiff's response is due October 27, 2020 (limited to 25 pages); and Defendants' reply is due November 3, 2020 (limited to 10 pages). Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 10/13/2020. (KEK)
October 12, 2020 Filing 20 Brief re #19 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Grantt Culliver, Phillip Dixon, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, DeWayne Estes, Gwendolyn Givens, Russell Jones, Gary Malone, Kevin White. (Hill, C)
October 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion for More Definite Statement by Grantt Culliver, Phillip Dixon, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, DeWayne Estes, Gwendolyn Givens, Russell Jones, Gary Malone, Kevin White. (Hill, C)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Unable to Forward) by Carrie Jean Huffman as to Anthony Brooks. (MEB2)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/24/2020. (SRD)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibson, Laura)
September 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3677112 (ALND receipt# B4601108608). (Gibson, Laura) Modified on 9/23/2020 (AKD).
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Jean Huffman. Jefferson Dunn served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020; Gary Malone served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (MEB2)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Jean Huffman. Phillip Dixon served on (no date on green card) (MEB2)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Jean Huffman. Russell Jones served on 9/13/2020, answer due 10/4/2020. (MEB2)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 ) filed by Carrie Jean Huffman. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/14/2020. (SRD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Gibson, Laura)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibson, Laura)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Gibson, Laura)
September 11, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3669707(B4601108387). (Gibson, Laura) Modified on 9/14/2020 (MEB2).
September 11, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3669701(B4601108386). (Gibson, Laura) Modified on 9/14/2020 (MEB2).
September 11, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3669690(B4601108385). (Gibson, Laura) Modified on 9/14/2020 (MEB2).
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibson, Laura)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibson, Laura)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gibson, Laura)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Jean Huffman. Grantt Culliver served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (MEB2)
September 10, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3668973(B4601108372). (Gibson, Laura) Modified on 9/10/2020 (MEB2).
September 10, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3668978(B4601108374). (Gibson, Laura) Modified on 9/10/2020 (MEB2).
September 10, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3668981(B4601108375). (Gibson, Laura) Modified on 9/10/2020 (MEB2).
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Jean Huffman. DeWayne Estes served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020; Gwendolyn Givens served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020; Kevin White served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (MEB2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anthony Brooks, Grantt Culliver, Phillip Dixon, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, DeWayne Estes, Gwendolyn Givens, Karla Jones, Russell Jones, Gary Malone, Rafael Santa-Maria, Cedric Specks, Kevin White. MAILED CERTIFIED MAIL. (MEB2)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Carrie Jean Huffman. (Gibson, Laura)
September 1, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3663008(B4601108148). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carrie Jean Huffman.(SRD). (Gibson, Laura) Modified on 9/1/2020 (MEB2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Specks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Jones
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Malone
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Dixon
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO1 Rafael Santa-Maria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden II DeWayne Estes
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Shift Commanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Jean Huffman
Represented By: Laura S Gibson
Represented By: Gregory Kendall Smith
Represented By: Zachary Payne-Meili
Represented By: Brian Earl
Represented By: Julia L Bensur
Represented By: Steven M Bierman
Represented By: Leslie Kuhn-Thayer
Represented By: Ellen Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?