Mills v. Cherokee County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Rudy Lee Mills
Defendant: Cherokee County Detention Center and Michael Zenk
Case Number: 4:2020cv01506
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/19/2020. (AKD)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Prisoner Account Information by Rudy Lee Mills (AKD)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rudy Lee Mills. (AKD)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING - The plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is deficient for the reason(s) indicated below. The plaintiff must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order, in the manner explained below. Although the plaintiff filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis, the application was not accompanied by a certified copy of jail and/or prison account statements for the last six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP form)(KEK)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rudy Lee Mills. (AKD)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cherokee County Detention Center, Michael Zenk, filed by Rudy Lee Mills.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Cherokee County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Lee Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?