Campos-Garcia v. Donald Trump et al
Plaintiff: Jefferson Campos-Garcia
Defendant: Johnathan Horton, Matthew Albence, Chad Wolf, Dianne Witte, Donald Trump, William O'Bryant, Bryan S. Pitman and William Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv01520
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order (doc.7) sent to Jefferson Campos Garcia (AKD)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order (doc. 8) sent to Jefferson Campos Garcia (AKD)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Jefferson Campos-Garcia. The undersigned RECOMMENDS the court DISMISS this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/9/2020. (SRD)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The plaintiff is ORDERED to supply the court with his correct, current mailing address and inform the court whether he wishes to continue prosecuting this action within twenty-one (21) days of the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/19/2020. (SRD)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/5/2020. (SRD)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:20-cv-02537. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/1/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jefferson Campos-Garcia (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jj2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jefferson Campos-Garcia (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(jj2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jefferson Campos-Garcia (jj2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan S. Pitman, Chad Wolf, Dianne Witte, Donald Trump, Johnathan Horton, Matthew Albence, William Barr, William O'Bryant, filed by Jefferson Campos-Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(jj2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos-Garcia v. Donald Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William O'Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan S. Pitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson Campos-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?