Bell v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: James Bell
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2021cv00181
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bell. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 3/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (MEB2)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to US Marshal's for service. (MEB2)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 02-26-21. (HMM)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Bell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(PSM)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by James Bell.(PSM)
February 8, 2021 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bell
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?