Pilcher v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: J Thomas Pilcher, IV
Defendant: Gary Malone, William Curtis Streeter, Jefferson Dunn, Grant Culliver, Mark Fassl, Dr Walter Wilson, Edward Ellington, Kelley Phillips, Cheryl Price, Shawn Geohagan, Gwendolyn Givens, Cedric Specks, Carla Graham, Wexford Health Sources Incorporated, Karla Jones, Dr Manuel Pouparinas, Anthony Brooks, Raphael Santa-Maria, Ruth Naglich and Kevin White
Case Number: 4:2021cv00204
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Summons Returned Unexecuted by J Thomas Pilcher, IV as to Cedric Specks. (KEK)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by J Thomas Pilcher, IV (Gibson, Laura)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Set Aside Service of Walter Wilson, M.D. by Wexford Health Sources Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants Ruth Naglich and William Streeter's unopposed motion for an extension of time. (Doc. #37 ). Defendants SHALL file a responsive pleading on or before May 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/8/2021. (KEK)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Amended Complaint by Ruth Naglich, William Curtis Streeter. (Rogers, Stephen)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Anthony Brooks. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Grant Culliver, Karla Jones. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Before the court are Defendants Shawn Geohagen, Kelly Phillips, and Manuel Pouparinas, M.D.'s, motions to set aside service. (Docs. #32 , #33 ). Defendants argue that service was improper because Plaintiff J. Thomas Pilcher, IV, served them by an improper registered agent. (Doc. #32 at 2; Doc. #33 at 2). Accordingly, the court ORDERS Mr. Pilcher to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before April 12, 2021, why the court should not set aside service on Defendants Shawn Geohagen, Kelly Phillips, and Manuel Pouparninas, M.D. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/5/2021. (KEK)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Set Aside #31 Summons Returned Executed, by Manuel Pouparinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Set Aside #31 Summons Returned Executed, by Shawn Geohagan, Kelley Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piggott, Philip)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Jefferson Dunn served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021; Edward Ellington served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021; Shawn Geohagan served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; Kelley Phillips served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; Manuel Pouparinas served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; Cheryl Price served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021; Walter Wilson served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (KEK)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Mark Fassl served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. (KEK)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants Carla Graham, Gary Malone, Kevin White, Raphael Santa-Maria, and Gwendolyn Givens' unopposed motion for an extension of time. (Doc. #28 ). Defendants SHALL file a responsive pleading on or before May 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/29/2021. (KEK)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, Raphael Santa-Maria, Kevin White. (Tompkins, Terri)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Ruth Naglich served (no date on green card). (KEK)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants Jefferson S. Dunn, Mark Fassl, Edward Ellington, and Cheryl Price's unopposed motion for an extension of time. (Doc. #25 ). Defendants SHALL file a responsive pleading on or before May 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/26/2021. (KEK)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Amended Complaint by Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Mark Fassl, Cheryl Price. (Rogers, Stephen)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Grantt Culliver by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. (KEK)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Gwendolyn Givens by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. (KEK)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Carla Graham served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; Gary Malone served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; Raphael Santa-Maria served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; William Curtis Streeter served on 3/18/2021, answer due 4/8/2021. (KEK)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Anthony Brooks, Grant Culliver, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Mark Fassl, Shawn Geohagan, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Ruth Naglich, Kelley Phillips, Manuel Pouparinas, Cheryl Price, Raphael Santa-Maria, Cedric Specks, William Curtis Streeter, Kevin White. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV.(Gibson, Laura)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by J Thomas Pilcher, IV as to Karla Jones. (KEK)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Wexford Health Sources Incorporated served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021. (KEK)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. William Curtis Streeter served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021 (no signature or date on green card). (KEK)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Grantt Culliver by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. (KEK)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Gwendolyn Givens by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. (KEK)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - This case is before the court on a sua sponte review of the complaint. For the reasons below, the court STRIKES the complaint and ORDERS Plaintiff to replead it in conformity with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the pleading standards of the Eleventh Circuit. Accordingly, the court STRIKES the complaint. On or before March 12, 2021, Mr. Pilcher SHALL replead his complaint in conformity with Rules 8(a)(2) and 10(b) and the Eleventh Circuit's instructions about pleading a complaint. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 2/25/2021. (KEK)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Gary Malone served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021; Raphael Santa-Maria served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (KEK)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Shawn Geohagan served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021; Manuel Pouparinas served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021; Cheryl Price served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021; Walter Wilson served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (KEK)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 2/24/21. (SAC)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Gwendolyn Givens. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Grant Culliver. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Karla Jones by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. (KEK)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Jefferson Dunn served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021; Edward Ellington served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021; Mark Fassl served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021; Ruth Naglich served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021. (KEK)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Wexford Health Sources Incorporated.(Piggott, Philip)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. Carla Graham served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (KEK)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by J Thomas Pilcher, IV as to Kelley Phillips (RTS - no longer here), Kevin White (RTS - not there). (KEK)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Anthony Brooks by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. (MEB2)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anthony Brooks, Grant Culliver, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Mark Fassl, Shawn Geohagan, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Ruth Naglich, Kelley Phillips, Manuel Pouparinas, Cheryl Price, Raphael Santa-Maria, Cedric Specks, William Curtis Streeter, Wexford Health Sources Incorporated, Kevin White, Walter Wilson. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ***STRICKEN*** COMPLAINT against Anthony Brooks, Grant Culliver, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Mark Fassl, Shawn Geohagan, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Ruth Naglich, Kelley Phillips, Manuel Pouparinas, Cheryl Price, Raphael Santa-Maria, Cedric Specks, William Curtis Streeter, Wexford Health Sources Incorporated, Kevin White, Walter Wilson, filed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. (MEB2) Modified on 2/26/2021 (KEK).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3773529. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Brooks, Grant Culliver, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Mark Fassl, Shawn Geohagan, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Ruth Naglich, Kelley Phillips, Manuel Pouparinas, Cheryl Price, Raphael Santa-Maria, Cedric Specks, William Curtis Streeter, Wexford Health Sources Incorporated, Kevin White, Walter Wilson, filed by J Thomas Pilcher, IV. (MEB2). (Gibson, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilcher v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Malone
Represented By: Christian Alexandra Montgomery
Represented By: Terri Olive Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Curtis Streeter
Represented By: Kenneth S Steely
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Represented By: Kenneth S Steely
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fassl
Represented By: Kenneth S Steely
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Walter Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Represented By: Kenneth S Steely
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley Phillips
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Price
Represented By: Kenneth S Steely
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Geohagan
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Represented By: Christian Alexandra Montgomery
Represented By: Terri Olive Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Specks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Graham
Represented By: Christian Alexandra Montgomery
Represented By: Terri Olive Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Incorporated
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Manuel Pouparinas
Represented By: Philip G Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael Santa-Maria
Represented By: Christian Alexandra Montgomery
Represented By: Terri Olive Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Naglich
Represented By: Kenneth S Steely
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Represented By: Christian Alexandra Montgomery
Represented By: Terri Olive Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Thomas Pilcher, IV
Represented By: Laura S Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?