Guy v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Carol Guy
Defendant: Tanya Ary, Antoine Price, Jefferson Dunn, Kevin White, William Ragsdale, Edward Ellington, Christy Vincent, Angelia Gordy, Gary Malone, Cynthia Caver, Gwendolyn Givens, Karla Jones, Charles Daniels, LaTonya Scott, Carla Graham, Grantt Culliver, Jeffery Williams, Anthony Brooks, Neketris Estelle and Officer Wilson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00264
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by Carol Guy. (Brown, Ruth)
April 13, 2021 Filing 34 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:21-cv-264-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER: Certain defendants have filed a motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion for more definite statement. (Doc. #31 ). The plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a response to the motion within fourteen (14) calendar days from the entry date of this order. The moving defendants SHALL file any reply within seven (7) calendar days from the date on which the plaintiffs response is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/13/21. (MRR, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 32 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement re #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tanya Ary, Anthony Brooks, Cynthia Caver, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Angelia Gordy, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, Antoine Price, William Ragsdale, LaTonya Scott, Kevin White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Axon's Order)(Walter, James) Modified text on 4/13/2021 (MRR, ).
April 12, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Tanya Ary, Anthony Brooks, Cynthia Caver, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Angelia Gordy, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, Antoine Price, William Ragsdale, LaTonya Scott, Kevin White. (Walter, James) Modified text on 4/13/2021 (MRR, ).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER- The parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 26, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after April 26, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 4/12/21. (MRR, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 29 Alias Summons Issued as to Charles Daniels, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
April 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Conference held on 4/12/2021. (BST, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 28 Alias Summons Issued as to Charles Daniels, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 27 Request for service by certified mail filed by Carol Guy. (Brown, Ruth)
April 5, 2021 Filing 26 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Carol Guy as to William Ragsdale. (MRR, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Charles Daniels, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted- Green card detached by Carol Guy as to Kevin White. (MRR, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Carol Guy as to Angelia Gordy. (MRR, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carol Guy. Christy Vincent waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Brown, Ruth)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Defendants Gwendolyn Givens, Gary Malone, Kevin White, Carla Graham, Neketris Estelle, Tanya Ary, and LaTonya Scott have filed an unopposed motion seeking an extension of time until April 12, 2021, to respond to the plaintiff's complaint. (Doc. #15 ). Additionally, defendants Jefferson S. Dunn, Jeffery Williams, and Edward Ellington have filed an unopposed motion seeking an extension of time until April 26, 2021, to respond to the plaintiff's complaint. (Doc. #20 ). For good cause shown, each motion is GRANTED. This case is SET for a telephone status conference at 10:00 A.M. on April 12, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/26/21. (MRR, )
March 26, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Tanya Ary answer due 4/12/2021; Jefferson Dunn answer due 4/26/2021; Edward Ellington answer due 4/26/2021; Neketris Estelle answer due 4/12/2021; Gwendolyn Givens answer due 4/12/2021; Carla Graham answer due 4/12/2021; Gary Malone answer due 4/12/2021; LaTonya Scott answer due 4/12/2021; Kevin White answer due 4/12/2021; Jeffery Williams answer due 4/26/2021. (MRR, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 3/24/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Jeffery Williams. (Rogers, Stephen)
March 23, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jackson Britton on behalf of Tanya Ary, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, LaTonya Scott, Kevin White (Britton, William)
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Northcutt on behalf of Tanya Ary, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, LaTonya Scott, Kevin White (Northcutt, Robert)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by C Richard Hill, Jr on behalf of Tanya Ary, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, LaTonya Scott, Kevin White (Hill, C)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 Request for service by certified mail filed by Carol Guy. (Brown, Ruth)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Motion is RIPE 3/22/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tanya Ary, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, LaTonya Scott, Kevin White. (Walter, James) Modified text on 3/22/2021 (MRR, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James N Walter, Jr on behalf of Tanya Ary, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, LaTonya Scott, Kevin White (Walter, James)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Guy. Tanya Ary served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021; Neketris Estelle served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021; Carla Graham served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021; Gary Malone served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (MRR, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Guy. Jefferson Dunn served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021; Edward Ellington served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021; Christy Vincent served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021; Jeffery Williams served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (MRR, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Guy. Kevin White served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (MRR, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Guy. Gwendolyn Givens served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (MRR, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Guy. LaTonya Scott served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (MRR, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Tanya Ary, Charles Daniels, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Neketris Estelle, Gwendolyn Givens, Angelia Gordy, Carla Graham, Gary Malone, William Ragsdale, LaTonya Scott, Christy Vincent, Kevin White, Jeffery Williams. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The motions seeking leave for Megan Pierce and Ruth Brown to appear pro hac vice for the plaintiff in this action (Docs. #4 , #5 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/24/21. (MRR, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Anthony Brooks, Grantt Culliver. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Ruth Brown Motion is RIPE 2/22/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Carol Guy. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, Cert of Good Standing)(Mujumdar, Anil)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Megan Pierce Motion is RIPE 2/22/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Carol Guy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, CA Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, IL Cert of Good Standing)(Mujumdar, Anil)
February 22, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3781797 (B4601111579). (Mujumdar, Anil) Modified on 2/22/2021 (MRR, ).
February 22, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3781803 (b4601111580). (Mujumdar, Anil) Modified on 2/22/2021 (MRR, ).
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Carol Guy. (MRR, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carol Guy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, )
February 19, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3781065 (B4601111569). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carol Guy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ). (Pierce, Megan) Modified on 2/22/2021 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Ary
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Price
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ragsdale
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Vincent
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelia Gordy
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Malone
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Caver
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaTonya Scott
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Graham
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Williams
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brooks
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neketris Estelle
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Guy
Represented By: Megan Colleen Pierce
Represented By: Anil A Mujumdar
Represented By: Ruth Zemel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?