McCarley v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: John McCarley
Defendant: Gary Malone, Antoine Price, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Matthew Brand, Sgt. Derrick Dent, Errol Pickens, Jenny Abbott, Steve Watson, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Arnaldo Mercado, Kevin White, Nekitris Estelle and Larry R Baker
Case Number: 4:2021cv00570
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. After consideration, and for good cause shown, the undersigned GRANTS the defendants' motion and they shall have until August 2, 2021, to respond to McCarley's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/3/2021. (PSM)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by William R Lunsford on behalf of Jenny Abbott, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Arnaldo Mercado, Steve Watson (Lunsford, William)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C Rogers on behalf of Jenny Abbott, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Arnaldo Mercado, Steve Watson (Rogers, Stephen)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Northcutt on behalf of Larry R Baker, Derrick Dent, Nekitris Estelle, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Errol Pickens, Antoine Price, Kevin White (Northcutt, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jackson Britton on behalf of Larry R Baker, Derrick Dent, Nekitris Estelle, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Errol Pickens, Antoine Price, Kevin White (Britton, William)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by C Richard Hill, Jr on behalf of Larry R Baker, Derrick Dent, Nekitris Estelle, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Errol Pickens, Antoine Price, Kevin White (Hill, C)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by James N Walter, Jr on behalf of Larry R Baker, Derrick Dent, Nekitris Estelle, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Errol Pickens, Antoine Price, Kevin White (Walter, James)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Larry R Baker, Derrick Dent, Nekitris Estelle, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Gary Malone, Errol Pickens, Antoine Price, Kevin White. (Walter, James)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John McCarley. Derrick Dent served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021; Nekitris Estelle served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021; Carla Graham served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021; Antoine Price served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Green cards not dated, used Filed date as Date Served) (MEB2)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John McCarley. Karla Jones served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021. (MEB2)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Matthew Brand by John McCarley. (MEB2)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John McCarley. Jenny Abbott served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Jefferson Dunn served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Edward Ellington served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Arnaldo Mercado served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Steve Watson served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021. (MEB2)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - On May 4, 2021, Plaintiff John McCarley filed a Motion for Leave for Brandon R. Keel and Charles Spalding, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Doc. #19 ). After review of the applications, the court GRANTS the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/4/2021. (KEK)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandon R. Keel and Charles Spalding by John McCarley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brandon R. Keel, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Charles Spalding, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Brandon R. Keel, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Charles Spalding)(Windsor, Alyse)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted by John McCarley as to Larry R Baker, Errol Pickens. (MEB2)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3832562. (Windsor, Alyse)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3832561. (Windsor, Alyse)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by John McCarley. (Christie, James)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John McCarley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (PSM)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3824565(ALND receipt #B4601112843). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John McCarley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (PSM). (Christie, James) Modified on 4/22/2021 (MEB2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarley v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Malone
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Price
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Derrick Dent
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Errol Pickens
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Abbott
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Watson
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Graham
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaldo Mercado
Represented By: Stephen C Rogers
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nekitris Estelle
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry R Baker
Represented By: William Jackson Britton
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McCarley
Represented By: Alyse Nicole Windsor
Represented By: Gaile Pugh Gratton
Represented By: James Sturgeon Christie, Jr
Represented By: Charles Spalding, Jr
Represented By: Brandon R Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?