Mata v. Allupick Inc et al
Plaintiff: Maria De Los Angeles Mata
Defendant: Allupick Inc, Tariku Samson, Abebe Baraki, Jear Logistics LLC and J&R Dallas Truck Repair Service LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00865
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria De Los Angeles Mata. J&R Dallas Truck Repair Service LLC served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (MRR, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jear Logistics LLC. filed by Jear Logistics LLC (Rue, Thomas)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Jear Logistics LLC.(Rue, Thomas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Allupick Inc, Tariku Samson.(Gray, James)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The parties' joint motion to extend the deadline to make an election regarding consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction is GRANTED. (Doc. #8 ). The deadline for the parties to make an election regarding consent is EXTENDED to September 22, 2021. In the absence of unanimous consent, this matter will be reassigned to a district judge by September 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/6/2021. (KEK)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria De Los Angeles Mata. Jear Logistics LLC served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (KEK)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to J&R Dallas Truck Repair Service LLC, Jear Logistics LLC., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maria De Los Angeles Mata.(Bruner, Robert)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Magistrate Consent Deadline by Maria De Los Angeles Mata. (Bruner, Robert)
July 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Conference held on 7/27/2021. (BST, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Tuesday, 7/27/2021; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, 24 hours in advance, the conference will be cancelled. (BST, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against JEAR Logistics, LLC, J&R Dallas Truck Repair Service, LLC, filed by Maria De Los Angeles Mata.(Bruner, Robert)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than August 15, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after August 15, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on July 27, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/2/21. (MRR, )
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26; rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/2/2021. (BST, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Allupick Inc, Tariku Samson.(Gray, James)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
June 25, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3870734 (B4601114247). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, case number 75-cv-2021-900100., filed by Allupick Inc, Tariku Samson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(MRR, ). (Gray, James) Modified on 6/28/2021 (MRR, ).
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, case number 75-cv-2021-900100., filed by Allupick Inc, Tariku Samson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(MRR, )
June 24, 2021 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maria De Los Angeles Mata.- Deemed filed 5/13/21, Circuit Court of St. Clair County (Doc 1-1 p.8 combined pdf)(MRR, )
June 24, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Abebe Baraki.-Deemed filed 6/7/21, Circuit Court of St. Clair County (Doc 1-5 p.23 of combined pdf) (MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mata v. Allupick Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allupick Inc
Represented By: James C Gray, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Williams Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tariku Samson
Represented By: James C Gray, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Williams Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abebe Baraki
Represented By: Ralph J Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jear Logistics LLC
Represented By: Herman F Cox, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Sidney Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&R Dallas Truck Repair Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Los Angeles Mata
Represented By: James Donald Sears
Represented By: Leslie Ann Wright
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: David Lee Bruce
Represented By: Robert P Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?