Cline v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Shannon Cline
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2021cv01295
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 10/27/2021, answer due 1/26/2022. (AHI)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to the USMS for service as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Court GRANTS the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 9/29/2021. (AHI)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shannon Cline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IFP Application)(AHI)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Shannon Cline.(AHI)
September 28, 2021 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Cline
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?