McGraw v. Knight
Plaintiff: Mary McGraw
Defendant: Ronald Knight
Counter Defendant: John Nunnelee, Carol Nunnelee and Angela Nunnelee Walker
Case Number: 4:2021cv01412
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Nunnelee. (KEK)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David C Livingston on behalf of Ronald Knight (Livingston, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JOINDER for Removal and Transfer filed by Angela Nunnelee Walker. (KEK)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Order filed by John Nunnelee. (KEK)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Keeping in mind that any doubts about removal should be resolved in favor of remand, see Burns v. Windsor Ins. Co., 31 F.3d 1092, 1095 (11th Cir. 1994), the court ORDERS Counterclaim Defendant John Nunnelee to show cause as to why the court should not remand this case to the Circuit Court of Etowah County, Alabama. Nunnelee's response to this order should not exceed 10 pages and is due by Friday, November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 10/29/2021. (KEK)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Remove State Circuit Court Case for Final Adjudication by John Nunnelee. (KEK)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing: Letter to the Court by John Nunnelee. (KEK)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Electronic Noticing by John Nunnelee. (KEK)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Nunnelee from Circuit Court of Etowah County, Alabama, case number CV-08-248-WBO. (KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGraw v. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Knight
Represented By: David C Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Nunnelee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Carol Nunnelee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Angela Nunnelee Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?