Hill et al v. Meta Platforms Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Catrice Hill, Slade Miller, Wesley Bolton Garmon and Sarah F Bailey
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc, Facebook Inc, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg and Starbelt LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00001
Filed: January 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Given the plaintiffs' failure to respond to the defendants' facially meritorious arguments in favor of dismissal, the Court GRANTS the defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. #7 ) and DISMISSES this case WITH PREJUDICE. The Court instructs the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/24/2022. (SRD)
August 5, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE by Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Second Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Prater, Harlan)
August 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by M Wesley Smithart (Smithart, M)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs filed a motion for extension of time shortly before this Court entered a show-cause order. (Docs. #16 , #17 ). The Court grants the motion for extension of time (doc. #16 ) and rescinds the show-cause order (doc. #17 ). The plaintiffs may file a consolidated 35-page response on or before Friday, July 29, 2022. And the defendants may file a 20-page reply on or before Friday, August 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/15/2022. (SRD)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The Court ORDERS the plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE in writing, by no later than Wednesday, June 22, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed under Rule 41(b) or under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 6/15/2022. (SRD)
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Sarah F Bailey, Wesley Bolton Garmon, Jennifer Catrice Hill, Slade Miller. (Kemmer, Erica)
June 10, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Prater, Harlan)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/10/2022. (SRD)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by M Wesley Smithart on behalf of Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg (Smithart, M)
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Brooks on behalf of Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg (Brooks, William)
May 9, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew D. Provance by Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Prater, Harlan)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Colin O. Lubelczyk by Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Prater, Harlan)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lauren R. Goldman by Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Prater, Harlan)
May 9, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4081767 (ALND B4601120111). (Prater, Harlan) Modified on 5/11/2022 (KEK).
May 9, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4081756 (ALND B4601120110). (Prater, Harlan) Modified on 5/11/2022 (KEK).
May 9, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4081744 (ALND B4601120109). (Prater, Harlan) Modified on 5/11/2022 (KEK).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court sets the following briefing schedule regarding the defendants' motion to dismiss. (Doc. #7 ). The Court orders the plaintiffs to file a single response (limited to 35 pages) on or before Friday, May 27, 2022. The defendants may file a reply (limited to 20 pages) on or before Friday, June 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/2/2022. (SRD)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Prater, Harlan)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the defendants' motion for leave to file a motion to dismiss that is up to 25 pages in length. (Doc. #5 ). Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 4/18/2022. (SRD)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Prater, Harlan)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the defendants' motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading. (Doc. #3 ). Their responsive pleading is now due on April 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 3/10/2022. (SRD)
March 10, 2022 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Meta Platforms Inc, Starbelt LLC, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Prater, Harlan)
March 4, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number B4601118873 (KAM)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Catrice Hill. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service)(Garmon, Trenton)
January 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Slade Miller, Jennifer Catrice Hill, Wesley Bolton Garmon, Sarah F Bailey; service by certified mail requested. (SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Meta Platforms Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Represented By: William H Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Represented By: William H Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Elliot Zuckerberg
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Represented By: William H Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbelt LLC
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Represented By: William H Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Catrice Hill
Represented By: Erica Kathleen Kemmer
Represented By: Trenton Rogers Garmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slade Miller
Represented By: Erica Kathleen Kemmer
Represented By: Trenton Rogers Garmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Bolton Garmon
Represented By: Trenton Rogers Garmon
Represented By: Erica Kathleen Kemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah F Bailey
Represented By: Erica Kathleen Kemmer
Represented By: Trenton Rogers Garmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?