Bates v. Brown et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jamin Bates
Defendant: Michael Brown and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00327
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Cullman
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER consistent with the parties joint stipulation of dismissal; DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; costs taxed as paid. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/25/2010. (KAM, )
October 25, 2010 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Joint) by Michael Brown, Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Anderson, Andrew)
July 12, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER denying 12 Motion to Compel, as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 07/12/10. (CAG, )
July 12, 2010 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Compel filed by Michael Brown. (Anderson, Andrew)
July 9, 2010 12 MOTION to Compel by Jamin Bates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Ferguson, Randy)
April 26, 2010 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Brown.(Anderson, Andrew)
April 12, 2010 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamin Bates. (Ferguson, Randy)
March 26, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 : QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/26/10. (CAG, )
March 26, 2010 8 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits apply as set out in this order; Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2010. Discovery due by 2/1/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2011. Pretrial needed; mediation 12/15/10. This case will be trial ready on 3/1/11. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/26/10. (CAG, )
March 26, 2010 7 MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulation) by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed HIPAA Order)(Anderson, Andrew)
March 26, 2010 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Anderson, Andrew)
March 15, 2010 5 Summons Issued as to Michael Brown, returned to pla for service. (CAG, )
March 9, 2010 4 Featured Case ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 03/09/10. (CAG, )
March 9, 2010 3 ANSWER to Complaint and CROSSCLAIM filed within body of Notice of Removal, deemed filed on 2/11/10 (filed in the Circuit Court of Cullman County, AL on 12/21/09) by McGriff Transportation, Inc.(CAG, )
March 9, 2010 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed within body of Notice of Removal, deemed filed on 2/11/10 (filed in the Circuit Court of Cullman County, AL on 1/5/10) by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(CAG, )
February 11, 2010 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Brown, Werner Enterprises, Inc. from Circuit Court of Cullman County, AL, case number CV-2009-000336.00. ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt No. B4601009933 ).(CAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamin Bates
Represented By: Randy W Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brown
Represented By: Thomas L Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?