Otis Elevator Company v. WG Yates & Sons Construction Company

Plaintiff: Otis Elevator Company
Defendant: WG Yates & Sons Construction Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv01708
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Inge P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2016 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/3/16. (SAC )
August 7, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/7/13. (ASL)
April 3, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/3/13. (ASL)
December 12, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 12/12/12. (ASL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otis Elevator Company v. WG Yates & Sons Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Elevator Company
Represented By: Tenley Armstrong
Represented By: E Glenn Waldrop, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WG Yates & Sons Construction Company
Represented By: Vesselin B Petrov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?