Steger v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Brian ONeal Steger
Defendant: Julian Johnson, Jamar Miles, Jason Ramsey, Eddie McDaniel, Tommy Battle, Huntsville, City of, Blake Dorning, Lewis Morris and Madison Morgan Co STAC HIDTA Team
Miscellaneous: staff attorney
Case Number: 5:2012cv03918
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Limestone
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING and ACCEPTING the Magistrate Judge's 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION with the exception of his consideration of the Plaintiff's State Law claims, as those claims were previously dismissed by this Co urt. The Defendants' pending 20 35 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment are DENIED, and this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this Opinion. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/31/2015. (JLC)
June 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court is of the Opinion that the Magistrate Judge's Report is hereby ADOPTED and the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation is ACCEPTED. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that all of plaintiff's claims in this action except the claims of excessive force against Officers Julian Johnson and Jamar Miles are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b). It is further ORDERED that the claims of excessive force against Officers Julian Johnson and Jamar Miles are REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/17/2013. (JLC, )
June 10, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND ACCEPTING RECOMMENDATION that all of pla's claims in this action except the claims of excessive force against Officers Julian Johnson and Jamar Miles are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b); further ORDERED that the claims of excessive force against Officers Julian Johnson and Jamar Miles are REFERRED to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/10/13. (ASL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steger v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian ONeal Steger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamar Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsville, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Dorning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Morgan Co STAC HIDTA Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: staff attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?