PNC Bank National Association v. Kennedy-Kennedy LLC et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank National Association
Defendant: Kennedy-Kennedy LLC, Douglas P Kennedy and Donald W Kennedy
Case Number: 5:2013cv00796
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF DISMISSAL-Plaintiff and defendants filed a stipulation of dismissal Doc #37 . Accordingly, any and all claims in this action hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear his or its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/9/14. (MRR )
October 8, 2014 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by PNC Bank National Association (Grill, Matthew) Modified on 10/9/2014 (MRR, ).
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER Status Conference set, via telephone, for 10/9/2014 10:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam.. Counsel may attend by calling 205 278 2186 (local) or 866 933 0528 (long distance) and entering pin #3893. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/15/2014. (PMA)
September 15, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held, in Chambers, on 9/15/2014-Court's preliminary remarks-Counsel's statements-Court to schedule another phone conference for early October-WRITTEN ORDER to be entered by the Court. (Court Reporter, None.) (RLD)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Status Conference set for 9/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. The parties may attend by telephone by calling 205 278 2186 (local) or 866 933 0528 (long distance), and entering pin # 3893. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/10/2014. (PMA)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christine Keifer Borton terminated. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/28/2014. (PMA)
May 23, 2014 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PNC Bank National Association. (Borton, Christine)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for completion of discovery is extended until August 11, 2014. The deadline for filing any dispositive motion is extended until September 9, 2014. Any pretrial conference will be set after Oct. 31, 2014. The parties will be trial-ready no later than Dec. 1, 2014. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/10/2014. (PMA)
February 6, 2014 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by PNC Bank National Association. (Borton, Christine)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/24/2013. (PMA)
October 23, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV by David L. White by Donald W Kennedy. (KAM, )
October 23, 2013 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number B4601046992 (KAM, )
October 11, 2013 Filing 28 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/10/2013. (KAM, )
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: certain time limits apply as set out in this order; Amended Pleadings due from pla by 1/10/2014 and from dftby 2/10/2014. Discovery due by 2/10/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/10/2014. Trial ready by 5/1/2014; the parties shall confer and notify the court within 30 days whetehr or not they consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/10/2013. (KAM, )
September 20, 2013 Filing 26 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam by Donald W Kennedy, PNC Bank National Association, filed by Donald W Kennedy, PNC Bank National Association, Kennedy-Kennedy LLC (KAM, )
September 16, 2013 Filing 25 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Donald W Kennedy.(KAM, )
September 16, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE - Initial Disclosures by Donald W Kennedy (KAM, )
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER-re: R&R #14 . The court hereby ADOPTS the Report of the Magistrate Judge and ACCEPTS the Recommendations. It is ORDERED that PNC Bank National Association's Motion for Default Judgment #10 is DENIED. This case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/16/2013. (AVC)
September 16, 2013 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Donald W Kennedy, Kennedy-Kennedy LLC, filed by PNC Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Borton, Christine)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER regarding review of Report and Recommendation, the clerk shall forwar the R&R to a randomly selected district judge. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/16/2013. (KAM, )
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to electronically file the amended complaint within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/12/2013. (Putnam, T)
September 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Scheduling Conference held, in Chambers and by telephone, on 9/12/2013-Court's preliminary remarks-Counsel's statements-Court addressed, with the parties, the option of consenting to a USMJ for dispositive jurisdiction-WRITTEN SCHEDULING ORDER to be entered by the Court. (Court Reporter, None.) (RLD)
September 3, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by PNC Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Borton, Christine)
August 29, 2013 Filing 18 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/29/2013. (KAM, )
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 15 Order setting scheduling conference. The defendant, who is appearing pro se, has requested that he be allowed to attend the scheduling conference via telephone. He may do so by calling chambers at 205-278-1900 at the time of the conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/28/2013. (PMA)
August 26, 2013 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Borton, Christine)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2013 10:00 AM in chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/26/2013. (PMA)
August 9, 2013 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Kennedy-Kennedy, LLC filed by PNC Bank National Association be denied; Objections to R&R due by 8/26/2013. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/9/2013. (KAM, )
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER pursuant to the notice of the plaintiff; any and all claims against dft Douglas P. Kennedy are dismissed w/out prejudice; Douglas P Kennedy terminated.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/7/2013. (KAM, )
August 7, 2013 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kennedy-Kennedy LLC (KAM, )
July 29, 2013 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Kennedy-Kennedy, LLC (Amended Affidavit of Matthew W. Grill) by PNC Bank National Association. filed by PNC Bank National Association (Borton, Christine)
July 29, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Kennedy-Kennedy, LLC by PNC Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew W. Grill, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Jim Garner)(Borton, Christine)
July 15, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PNC Bank National Association (Borton, Christine)
June 17, 2013 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Donald W Kennedy.(KAM, )
May 21, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank National Association. Donald W Kennedy served on 5/11/2013, answer due 6/3/2013. (Borton, Christine)
May 21, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank National Association. Kennedy-Kennedy LLC served on 5/6/2013, answer due 5/28/2013. (Borton, Christine)
May 21, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank National Association. Douglas P Kennedy served on 5/6/2013, answer due 5/28/2013. (Borton, Christine)
April 30, 2013 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donald W Kennedy, Douglas P Kennedy, Kennedy-Kennedy LLC, returned to Plaintiffs' attorney for service on this the 30th day of April, 2013. (JLC)
April 30, 2013 Filing Fee received in the amount of $350.00, receipt number B4601043079. (JLC)
April 29, 2013 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank National Association. filed by PNC Bank National Association (Borton, Christine)
April 29, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE regarding consent of a civil case to a magistrate judge (KAM, )
April 29, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald W Kennedy, Douglas P Kennedy, Kennedy-Kennedy LLC, filed by PNC Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM, )
April 29, 2013 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 350, receipt_number 1126-1912790. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Donald W Kennedy, Douglas P Kennedy, Kennedy-Kennedy LLC, filed by PNC Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM, ). (Borton, Christine) NDAL rec# B4601043079

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank National Association v. Kennedy-Kennedy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank National Association
Represented By: Christine Keifer Borton
Represented By: Matthew W Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy-Kennedy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W Kennedy
Represented By: David L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?