Huntsville Golf Development, Inc. v. Estate of Robert Brindley, Sr. et al

Plaintiff: Huntsville Golf Development, Inc.
Defendant: Estate of Robert Brindley, Sr., Robert Brindley, Richard White, Jeffery L. Brindley, Whitney Bank and The Whitney-Brindley Partnership
Case Number: 5:2013cv00870
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - For the reasons stated above, the Court grants the defendants motion for summary judgment on HGDs claims for breach of contract, fraud and deceit, and conspiracy. (Doc. 124).9 The Court also grants HGDs motion for summary judgment on the Estates counterclaim for breach of contract. (Doc. 127). The Court will enter a separate order consistent with this memorandum opinion. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/14/2017. (KEK)
December 16, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiff Huntsville Golf Development, Inc. (HGD) asks the Court for leave to amend its original complaint. (Doc. 90). The Court denies HGDs motion to amend because the proposed amendment would be futile. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/16/2016. (KEK)
September 29, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court grants in part and denies in part the motions to dismiss. The Court DENIES the motion to dismiss HGDs breach of contract claim against the Brindley Estate; DENIES the motion to dismiss HGDs fraud and deceit claim agains t the Brindley Estate; and DENIES the motions to dismiss the civil conspiracy to commit fraud and deceit claim against the Brindley Estate, Jeffery Brindley, and Whitney. The Court GRANTS the motions to dismiss all other claims brought by HGD and DISMISSES those claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/28/2015. (KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntsville Golf Development, Inc. v. Estate of Robert Brindley, Sr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntsville Golf Development, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick O'Neal Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Robert Brindley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brindley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery L. Brindley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Bank
Represented By: Stephen D Davis, II
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Kevin C Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Whitney-Brindley Partnership
Represented By: Stephen D Davis, II
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Kevin C Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?