Lee v. Thomas et al

Plaintiff: Rashad C Lee
Defendant: Kim Thomas, James Deloach, Grant Culliver, Cassandra Conway, Dewayne Estes, Kristen Bias and Shirley Brown
Miscellaneous: staff attorney
Case Number: 5:2013cv01365
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Limestone
Presiding Judge: Robert B Propst
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - Because the plaintiff has failed to produce evidence creating a genuine issue of material fact as to whether the locked smoke cages at LCF inflicted unnecessary pain or suffering caused by an unreasonable threat of injury or death by fire, Warden Estes is due summary judgment on the plaintiffs Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claim, and this action is to be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/8/2017. (KEK)
March 11, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OPINION AND PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER; REFERRING CASE BACK TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE; Plaintiff's 56 Objection to Report and Recommendations are OVERRULED. Shirley Brown terminated. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/11/2016. (JLC)
March 3, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER; The Magistrate Judge's Report is due to be and is hereby ADOPTED and his Recommendation is ACCEPTED. The MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendants, Thomas, Culliver, Conway, and Bia s is GRANTED, and the claims against them are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FINAL JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of defendants Thomas, Culliver, Conway, and Bias. The Court EXPRESSLY FINDS the claims against defendant Deloach are DISMISSED for L ack of Prosecution. Defendant Estes's Objection to the inmate affidavits are OVERRULED, and defendant Estes's request for additional time to respond to the footnote statement is DENIED. Accordingly, defendant Estes's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and the claim against him is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/3/2016. (JLC)
January 15, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER-re: Motions 12 , 13 , 14 & 16 . Pltf's motions for preliminary, emergency relief are DENIED. Pltf's motion to expedite 14 is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert B Propst on 1/15/2014. (AVC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashad C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Deloach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Bias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: staff attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?