Woodruff v. Athens State University
Plaintiff: Cathy L Woodruff
Defendant: Athens State University
Case Number: 5:2014cv01950
Filed: October 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Morgan
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER-In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion #21 , the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment #14 , is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/23/2016. (AVC)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/23/2016. (AVC)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING plff's #19 Emergency MOTION to Continue April 29, 2016 Hearing. The Hearing re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment is RESET for 5/26/2016, at Noon, Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/29/2016. (YMB)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Emergency MOTION to Continue April 29, 2016 Hearing by Cathy L Woodruff. (McDonald, Stanton)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Hearing re dft's #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Hearing set for Friday, 4/29/2016, at 1:30 PM, CR 4A, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/19/2016. (YMB)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Mediator (Royer, George)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Motion for Summary Judgment - parties are reminded of the briefing schedule outlined in Appendix II of the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/2/2016. (YMB)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EVIDENTIARY SUBMISSION in Support of Its #14 Motion for Summary Judgment by Athens State University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2, #4 Exhibit C, Part 1, #5 Exhibit C, Part 2, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Harding Hart, Christine) Modified on 3/1/2016 (YMB).
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Athens State University. (Harding Hart, Christine)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER-This case is appropriate for mediation. Any party may object to the referral to mediation by corresponding with the court's chambers by 1/22/2016. If neither party objects, the parties are DIRECTED to select an agreed upon mediator by 2/5/2016 and notify the court via chambers email. The mediation shall be completed on or before 3/4/2016. Within ten (10) days following mediation, the mediator will report to the court only that a settlement was reached or mediation was conducted and no settlement agreements were reached, whether each party acted in good faith to resolve the matter, and nothing more. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 1/8/2016. (AVC)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCOVERY NOTICE by Cathy L Woodruff. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement)(McDonald, Stanton) Modified on 5/5/2015 (YMB).
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2015. Mediation order issue date 12/29/2015. Discovery due by 1/29/2016. Dispositive motions due by 2/29/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2016, at 10:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 9/19/2016, at 9:00 AM, both at the Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/23/15. (YMB)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon: Rule 16(b) Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 4/23/2015. Scheduling order to be entered by the court. (KSS)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2015, at 11:00 AM, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. The parties are directed to initiate the telephone call between themselves, and to connect the court by calling 205-278-1854, five minutes prior to the designated call time as set out herein. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/13/15. (YMB)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harding Hart, Christine)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) and LR26.1(d) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 2/12/2015. (KSS)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2016 10:15 AM in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2016 9:00 AM in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 2/11/2015. (PSM)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Athens State University.(Waggoner, Mark)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE (Alabama Attorney General's Office) (PSM)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Athens State University. Delivered via certified mail. (PSM)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Cathy L Woodruff. (McDonald, Stanton)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number H4601002146 (PSM)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE regarding consent of a civil action to a magistrate judge. (AVC)
October 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Athens State University, filed by Cathy L Woodruff.(AVC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodruff v. Athens State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy L Woodruff
Represented By: Stanton H McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens State University
Represented By: Christine Harding Hart
Represented By: Edward Shane Black
Represented By: Mark T Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?