Bradley v. Franklin et al

Plaintiff: Leon W. Bradley
Defendant: Justin Powell, Robert Wilson, Blake Robinson, The Morgan County Sheriff's Office and Ana Franklin
Case Number: 5:2018cv01085
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Morgan
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2018 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, Robert Wilson. (Dukes, S)
August 30, 2018 22 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Rule 26(f) conference deadline is extended two (2) weeks to address the motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on August 30, 2018. (EBV)
August 30, 2018 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Leon W. Bradley. (McKinney, Rebekah)
August 29, 2018 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Franklin and MCSO filed by Leon W. Bradley. (McKinney, Rebekah)
August 29, 2018 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Robinson, Wilson and Powell filed by Leon W. Bradley. (McKinney, Rebekah)
August 29, 2018 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 Uniform Initial Order by Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, Robert Wilson. (Dukes, S)
August 29, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Morgan B Beckman terminated. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on August 29, 2018. (EBV)
August 24, 2018 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, Robert Wilson. (Beckman, Morgan)
August 10, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan B Beckman on behalf of Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, Robert Wilson (Beckman, Morgan)
August 10, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by April Willis McKay on behalf of Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, Robert Wilson (McKay, April)
August 10, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick A Howard on behalf of Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, Robert Wilson (Howard, Rick)
August 9, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Gray, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Gray, William)
August 8, 2018 11 Featured Case UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/8/2018. (PSM)
August 8, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER Before this Court is Defendants' Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, and Robert Wilson's Motion to Dismiss #8 and Defendant Ana Franklin and the Morgan County Sheriff's Office's Motion to Dismiss #9 . Plaintiff has twenty one (21) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motions.Defendants will thereafter have ten (10) days to file their respective replies. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/8/2018. (PSM)
August 7, 2018 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Ana Franklin, The Morgan County Sheriff's Office. (Spence, Robert)
August 6, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, Robert Wilson. (Dukes, S)
July 19, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon W. Bradley. Robert Wilson served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (McKinney, Rebekah)
July 19, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon W. Bradley. Blake Robinson served on 7/14/2018, answer due 8/4/2018. (McKinney, Rebekah)
July 19, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon W. Bradley. Justin Powell served on 7/14/2018, answer due 8/4/2018. (McKinney, Rebekah) Modified on 7/20/2018 (AHI).
July 19, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon W. Bradley. Ana Franklin served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (McKinney, Rebekah)
July 13, 2018 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Coogler until further notice; please use case number 5:18-cv-1085-UJH-LSC on all subsequent pleadings. (SPT )
July 13, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Ana Franklin, Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, The Morgan County Sheriff's Office, and Robert Wilson by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff's attorney for service. (SPT )
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ana Franklin, Justin Powell, Blake Robinson, The Morgan County Sheriff's Office, and Robert Wilson (Filing fee $ 400.00 w/ manual receipt #226384 {H4601003606}) filed by Leon W. Bradley.(SPT) Modified on 7/16/2018 (AHI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Franklin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Powell
Represented By: Rick A Howard
Represented By: Morgan B Beckman
Represented By: S Mark Dukes
Represented By: April Willis McKay
Represented By: William P Gray, Jr
Represented By: John David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilson
Represented By: Rick A Howard
Represented By: Morgan B Beckman
Represented By: S Mark Dukes
Represented By: April Willis McKay
Represented By: William P Gray, Jr
Represented By: John David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Robinson
Represented By: Rick A Howard
Represented By: Morgan B Beckman
Represented By: S Mark Dukes
Represented By: April Willis McKay
Represented By: William P Gray, Jr
Represented By: John David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Morgan County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: William P Gray, Jr
Represented By: John David Gray
Represented By: Robert M Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Franklin
Represented By: William P Gray, Jr
Represented By: John David Gray
Represented By: Robert M Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon W. Bradley
Represented By: Robert B Tuten
Represented By: Nickolas R Heatherly
Represented By: Philip M DeFatta
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?