Nix v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Appellee: PNC Bank, N.A.
Appellant: James Carlton Nix, III
Case Number: 5:2018cv01098
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Morgan
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEFING letter to counsel. (AFS)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD ON APPEAL by Clerk, US Bankruptcy Court ND-AL (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal dated 7/6/18, #2 Adversary Complaint, #3 Answer, #4 Order Requiring Post Trial Briefs, #5 Defendant's Post Trial Brief, #6 Plaintiff's Post Trial Brief, #7 Notice of Appeal, #8 Service of Notice of Appeal, #9 Appellant's Designations, #10 Amended Appellant's Designations, #11 Appellee's Designations DVD in BK Record containing designations, transcripts and record on appeal)(AFS)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE The court reminds the parties of the requirements of Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Parties must file with the Bankruptcy Court their designations, transcript(s)and a statement of the issues to complete the record on appeal. When the record on appeal is complete, the Bankruptcy Clerk of Court will transmit the record to this Court's Clerk of Court. The Court will set a briefing schedule following the Bankruptcy Clerk of Court's notice of transmitting the record. (AFS, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-81289-CRJ-7. File received, filed by James Carlton Nix, III. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Judgment, #3 Docket Sheet)(AFS) Modified on 7/18/2018 (AFS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nix v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Charles R Johanson, III
Represented By: Robert Tyler Clark
Represented By: Alto Lee Teague, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James Carlton Nix, III
Represented By: Kevin D Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?